Marion County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Marion County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Cardinal Health, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco, Inc., Prescription Supply, Inc., Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, SpecGX LLC, Meijer, Inc. and The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 1:2018op45529
Filed: May 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Marion
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2020 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Meijer, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Prescription Supply, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019; Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/4/2019 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Executed Waivers of Service)(Majestro, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
October 7, 2019 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr filed by on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.. (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 Amended complaint SHORT FORM against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) PRESCRIPTION SUPPLY, INC., WALMART INC., F/K/A WAL-MART STORES, INC., SPECGX, LLC, PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC., PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC., AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS, LLC, CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, THE KROGER CO., MEIJER, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.. Filed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. (Majestro, Anthony)
February 11, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/29/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 24, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 7/19/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 23, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 29, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 6/27/2018, answer due 8/27/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 21, 2018 Filing 10 Attorney Appearance by Paul T. Farrell, Jr filed by on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners. (Farrell, Paul)
June 19, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 6/15/2018, answer due 8/14/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 1, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 1, 2018 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. Cardinal Health waiver sent on 5/30/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Marion County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
May 3, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8687682.. Filed by Marion County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinberger, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. fka Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meijer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Christina L. Smith
Represented By: Paul T. Farrell, Jr.
Represented By: James S. Nelson
Represented By: James C. Powell
Represented By: Anthony J. Majestro
Represented By: William Hawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?