Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Cardinal Health, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis LLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Noramco, Inc., Allergan PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Actavis PLS, SpecGx LLC., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc, CVS Health Corporation, Watson Pharma, Inc. and Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45571
Filed: May 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Van Wert
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 5/2/2019, answer due 7/1/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 11, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation waiver sent on 6/7/2019, answer due 8/6/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2019, answer due 8/5/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. SpecGx LLC. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 5/16/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 5, 2019 Party Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., SpecGx LLC., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation and CVS Health Corporation added. filed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. (Weinberger, Peter)
April 23, 2019 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
March 16, 2019 Filing 21 Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Walmart Inc., f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; SpecGx LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation; CVS Health Corporation. Filed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. (Weinberger, Peter)
July 19, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 7/18/2018, answer due 9/17/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Ortho-McNeil-Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 18, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Purdue Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
July 3, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 27, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 6/26/2018, answer due 8/27/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 25, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 22, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 5 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 12, 2018 Filing 4 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 4, 2018 Filing 3 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. Cardinal Health waiver sent on 6/4/2018, answer due 8/3/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
June 4, 2018 Filing 2 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners (Weinberger, Peter)
May 14, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8704557.. Filed by Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weinberger, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGx LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janseen Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Wert County Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Peter H. Weinberger
Represented By: Eva J. Yarger
Represented By: J. Alan Smith
Represented By: William Hawal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?