County of Harris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: County of Harris
Defendant: Arun Sharma, Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Speciality, LP, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Richard Arthur Evans, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health 200, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., ICU Medical Sales Inc., Allergan PLC, Advanced Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, AbbVie Inc., Endo International plc, Mylan N.V., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Allergan Finance LLC, Allegiance Corporation, Mylan Pharms Inc., Mylan Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cardinal Health 100 Inc, NexGen Pharma, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cardinal Health 110, LLC, ICU Medical Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Gazelle Craig, Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation, Karin Sharma, David Devido, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Insys Manufacturing LLC, Mission Pharmacal Company, McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, Purdue Pharma Inc., Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc., Cardinal Health 414, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Fresenius Kabi USA, Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Advanced Pharma, Inc. doing business as Avella Specialty Pharmacy doing business as Avella of Houston, Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis Inc and Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC doing business as Neos Therapeutics LP
Interested Party: Illinois Union Insurance Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018op45677
Filed: June 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 115 Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Brandon Egan Caire and adding attorney Courtney E. Giles for ICU Medical Sales Inc. (P,R)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML(Related Doc #114 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/8/209.(P,R)
February 27, 2020 Filing 114 Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML filed by Plaintiff County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Rule 10 Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 113 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 10, 2019 Filing 112 Notice with attached Notice to Client by Don E. Lewis to withdraw as attorney field on behalf of Defendant Gazelle Craig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(B,R) Modified on 2/27/2020 (P,R).
September 4, 2018 Filing 111 Objection to Filing Responses to the government Plaintiff Fact Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Objections to filing responses to the government plaintiff fact sheet) (Gallagher, Michael)
July 16, 2018 Filing 110 Attorney Appearance by William B. Graham filed on behalf of David Devido. (P,R)
July 16, 2018 Filing 109 Attorney Appearance by Q. Tate Williams filed on behalf of David Devido. (P,R)
June 7, 2018 Filing 108 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Southern. Case number 4:18-cv-00490. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 6, 2018 Interdistrict transfer to Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Filing 107 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL Docket No. 2804. (lgouadi, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice of the filed on May 31, 2018 the following defendants are dismissed with prejudice Mylan Inc., Mylan Specialty L.P., and Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Mylan Speciality, LP, Mylan Pharms Inc., Mylan, Inc. by Mylan Speciality, LP, Mylan Pharms Inc., Mylan, Inc., filed. (Boyce, Maria) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Continuance. The deadlines for the Rule 26(f) conference and report, and the Rule 16 case management conference are continued until the JPML and this Court have had an opportunity to rule on pending motions.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Filing 103 Unopposed SUPPLEMENT to #101 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by Abbott Laboratories, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA Inc., Cephalon, Inc., David Devido, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Richard Arthur Evans, Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mylan, Inc., Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting #98 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Fresenius USA to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit is extended to July 20, 2018.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Deadlines by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 100 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan Finance LLC re: #89 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (drodriguez, 7) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed.(McConnico, Stephen) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Respond by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE Letter to Honorable David Hittner by ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed. (Caire, Brandon) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 96 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE Supplement to Certficate of Interested Parties by Richard Arthur Evans, filed. (Hetherington, G) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 94 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 93 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allergan Finance LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Allergan Finance LLC, filed.(Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 91 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 90 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #79 Notice of Reassignment Following Recusal, filed. (sanderson, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #85 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Fresenius USA to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit is extended to June 4, 2018.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 88 Request for Expedited Consideration of Its Motion to Remand by County of Harris, filed.(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/20/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Stephen Smith(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 86 Mail Returned Undeliverable (Return to Sender/Unable to Forward) as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #78 Recusal Order, filed. (rnieto, 1) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 85 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit until May 4, 2018..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Nonsuit as to all claims against Nexgen Pharma, Inc..(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Stacey Anne Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (dhansen, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Fresenius USA Manufacturing Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lunceford, Erin) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Christopher) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Nonsuit without prejudice of Nexgen Pharma, Inc., by County of Harris and Nexgen Parma, Inc. by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falconer, Russell) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time of Complaint Response Deadline by Abbott Laboratories, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales LLC, Allergan USA Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Mylan, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for Stacey Anne Mahoney to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/9/2018. (Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 72 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed.(Dawson, William) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 71 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch as to Allergan PLC re: #69 Order, filed. (vcantu, 5) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 30, 2018 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by David Devido, filed.(Hilder, Philip) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ; Motion-related deadline set re: #2 MOTION to Remand Replies due by 4/6/2018(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen E. McConnico on behalf of Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed. (McConnico, Stephen) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell H. Falconer on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Falconer, Russell) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Davies on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Davies, Tracey) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie K. McGuire on behalf of David Devido, filed. (McGuire, Stephanie) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 64 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Allergan PLC re: #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, filed. (cvillegas, 7) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's lawsuit; Answer due for NexGen Pharma, Inc. 4/20/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by William B. Dawson on behalf of NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. (Dawson, William) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to this Lawsuit by NexGen Pharma, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Falconer, Russell) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Creech on behalf of David Devido, filed. (Creech, Paul) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 22, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip H. Hilder on behalf of David Devido, filed. (Hilder, Philip) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 58 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed.(Jones, Christopher) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 19, 2018 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC identifying Neos Therapeutics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jones, Christopher) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 56 RESPONSE to #4 Order for Initial Conference - FORM, filed by Karin Sharma. (klopez, 7) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum Joinder, filed by Mission Pharmacal Company. (Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC 4/20/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE Opposition to Mylan Inc.'s Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition to #2 MOTION to Remand, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit by Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Lawsuit)(Jones, Christopher) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra A. LoCasto on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. (LoCasto, Alexandra) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Scott Jones on behalf of Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC, filed. (Jones, Christopher) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon E. Caire on behalf of ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed. (Caire, Brandon) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 46 STATEMENT of Non-Consent to Removal re: #1 Notice of Removal,, by ICU Medical Sales Inc., filed.(Caire, Brandon) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 47 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch - Kirkland and Ellis - Return to Sender - Unable to Forward as to Allergan re: #4 Order for Initial Conference, filed. (rnieto, 1) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 45 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Donna M Welch, Kirkland and Ellis #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (SandraSilva, 7) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 44 Letter to Honorable Nancy F. Atlas by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 8, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel by County of Harris, filed. (Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed.(Scott, Robert) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 39 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. identifying Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mission Pharmacal Company, filed.(Johnson, Brian) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., filed.(Vitale, Christina) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Advanced Pharma, Inc., filed.(Foley, Zandra) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Mylan, Inc., filed.(Boyce, Maria) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharmaceuticals L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, filed.(Reed, Noelle) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 7, 2018 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbott Laboratories, filed.(Ertas, Alper) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY in Support of #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re: #2 MOTION to Remand by Mylan, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Knoll Pharmaceutical Company identifying AbbVie Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Wilkes, John) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 27 REPLY in Support of #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 100 Inc, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 26 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. identifying McKesson Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jordan, Marquel) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation, filed.(Jordan, Marquel) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Manufacturing LLC identifying INSYS Therapeutics, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 23 Certificate of Service in a Removed Action by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, filed.(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Sarokhanian on behalf of Insys Manufacturing LLC, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., filed. (Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Raley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, filed by Mylan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Boyce, Maria) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 27, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., filed.(Raley, Matthew) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Zandra E. Foley and Cory S. Reed on behalf of Advanced Pharma, Inc. d/b/a Avella Specialty Pharmacy and/or Avella of Houston, filed. (Foley, Zandra) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 16 First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Richard Arthur Evans, M.D., filed.(Hetherington, G) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 26, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Richard Arthur Evans, M.D., filed.(Hetherington, G) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Cardinal Health 110 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 200 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 414 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; McKesson Corporation 4/23/2018; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. 4/23/2018; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Cardinal Health 110 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 200 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health 414 LLC 4/23/2018; Cardinal Health, Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc. 4/23/2018; McKesson Corporation 4/23/2018; McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc. 4/23/2018.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document #10 by County of Harris, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation identifying AmerisourceBergen Corporation and AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation as Corporate Parent, filed.(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 22, 2018 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12, filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #2 MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed.(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133 District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2017-82618 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19619838) filed by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 200 LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Harris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arun Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T. Ertas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Speciality, LP
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Marquel Sautural Jordan
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Arthur Evans
Represented By: G. Riley Hetherington, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 200, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Medical Sales Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Egan Caire
Represented By: Courtney E. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Zandra E. Foley
Represented By: Robert W. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AbbVie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegiance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharms Inc.
Represented By: Adam K. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Inc.
Represented By: Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Hannah DeMarco Sibiski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 100 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NexGen Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Tracey B. Davies
Represented By: Russell H. Falconer
Represented By: William B. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICU Medical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Charles Stanton Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gazelle Craig
Represented By: Don E. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karin Sharma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Devido
Represented By: Paul L. Creech
Represented By: Stephanie K. McGuire
Represented By: Q. Tate Williams
Represented By: William B. Graham
Represented By: Philip Harlan Hilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Represented By: John Laurens Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Pharmacal Company
Represented By: Brian P. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical, Inc.
Represented By: Marquel Sautural Jordan
Represented By: Robert Philip Scott, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen E. McConnico
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC
Represented By: Alexandra Ann LoCasto
Represented By: Christopher Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Noelle M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius USA Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: Erin E. Lunceford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health 414, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Mengis
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Raley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresenius Kabi USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Pharma, Inc. doing business as Avella Specialty Pharmacy doing business as Avella of Houston
Represented By: Zandra E. Foley
Represented By: Robert W. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christina Marie Vitale
Represented By: Stacey Anne Mahoney
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neos Therapeutics Brands LLC doing business as Neos Therapeutics LP
Represented By: Alexandra Ann LoCasto
Represented By: Christopher Scott Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Harris
Represented By: Michael T. Gallagher
Represented By: Vincent Reed Ryan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?