American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Impax Generics, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, UCB Inc., Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Cardinal Health Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Aurolife Pharma LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Alvogen Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., KVK-Tech, Inc., Impax Laboratories, Inc., Tris Pharma, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45910
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Filing 75 Attorney Appearance by Diane E. Lifton filed on behalf of UCB Inc. (P,R)
August 2, 2018 Filing 74 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-00145. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 1, 2018 Filing 73 Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Case Closed. (Attachments: #1 Order Lifting Stay) (tgw) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Order. The Court construes the Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (docs. 70, 71), additionally, as motions to lift the stay as to Defendant Aurolife Pharma LLC and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. Accordingly, the stay is lifted for purposes of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissals. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), no orders will be entered. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). Additionally the stay is REINSTATED upon dismissal of these Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/26/2018. (khc) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Order: The Court construes Doc. #68 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as, additionally, a motion to lift the stay as to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. It is ORDERED that the stay is accordingly lifted for purposes of Doc. 68, Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Per Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), no order will be entered. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). Additionally the stay is REINSTATED upon dismissal of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/19/2018. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 10, 2018 REFERRAL OF #68 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
July 10, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 67 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 66 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis, LLC served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Thomason Pryor on behalf of Tris Pharma, Inc. (Pryor, Caroline) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Oliver, II on behalf of Tris Pharma, Inc. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by F. Grey Redditt, Jr on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Redditt, F.) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel Eli Lightner, II on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Lightner, Hansel) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Walker on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ENDORSED ORDER granting #58 Defendants' unopposed Motion to Stay (filed with consent of Plaintiff). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/20/18. (gcp) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 20, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #58 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay and REFERRAL OF #59 Memorandum in Support to Judge DuBose. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 59 Memorandum in Support re #58 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Mattei, Blair) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Mattei, Blair) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ENDORSED ORDER granting #53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Thomas E. Rice. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Suzanne E. Billam. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ENDORSED ORDER granting #42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by William J. Beausoleil. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 18, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #44 MOTION for Suzanne E. Billam to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #53 MOTION for Thomas E. Rice, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 18, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #42 MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice and #54 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by UCB, Inc. re: #42 MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211173, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for Thomas E. Rice, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211598, Online Credit Card Payment.) by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing) (Rice, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Shayna S. Cook. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/17/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 51 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 49 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 48 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. McKesson Corporation served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Aurolife Pharma LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Abbott Laboratories served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Suzanne E. Billam to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211497, Online Credit Card Payment.) by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Billam, Suzanne) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 17, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #43 MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Downs, Helen) Modified on 4/17/2018 (cmj) (Filing Fee $50, Receipt No. 18460300390) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211173, Online Credit Card Payment.) by UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 16, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Kathryn Downs on behalf of UCB, Inc. (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick George Helmsing, Jr on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc. (Helmsing, Frederick) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 12, 2018 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Allergan PLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. KVK-Tech, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Impax Generics served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H.) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 9, 2018 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Tris Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Specgx LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt PLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Johnson & Johnson served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Impax Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Cephalon, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis South Atlantic LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 5, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. UCB, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Alvogen Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
April 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
March 28, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
March 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2201657, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons, #39 Summons, #40 Summons, #41 Summons, #42 Summons) (Busby, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2018: #43 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah). [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Blair Graffeo Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Generics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCB Inc.
Represented By: Shayna Susanne Cook
Represented By: William J. Beausoleil
Represented By: Helen Kathryn Downs
Represented By: Diane E. Lifton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Blair Graffeo Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurolife Pharma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: F. Grey Redditt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: David L. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: H. Lanier Brown, II
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvogen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Earl Rice, Jr.
Represented By: Suzanne Elizabeth Billam
Represented By: Frederick George Helmsing, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tris Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas L. Oliver, II
Represented By: Caroline Thomason Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
Represented By: Thomas E. Walker
Represented By: Hansel Eli Lightner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Blair Graffeo Mattei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Resources Insurance Company, Inc
Represented By: David Anthony Busby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?