Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Robinson Rancheria
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. and Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45912
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 44 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney S. Albert Wang filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Morris, Sean)
September 10, 2018 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 36 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Remand filed by Robinson Rancheria. Related document(s) #14 .(Frazer, T.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 29 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 28 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 27 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 26 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Robinson Rancheria. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Robinson Rancheria (Daniel, J.)
August 8, 2018 Filing 25 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-02525. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2018 Filing 24 MDL TRANSFER ORDER, TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL. No. 2804. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/16/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing re Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand and Defendants' Motions to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 7/12/2018. The Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE #14 MOTION to Remand , #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY (re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/19/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byRobinson Rancheria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, #2 Exhibit 1. Settlement Agreement and Release, #3 Exhibit 2. Order Regarding State Court Coordination)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 18 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #14 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori White, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Van Tassell, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/12/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byRobinson Rancheria. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, #2 Exhibit 1. MDL 2804 Order, 12-14-2017, #3 Exhibit 2. MDL 2804 Order, 2-16-2018, #4 Exhibit 3. MDL 2804 Order, 5-17-2018)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/11/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #6 Administrative Motion to Relate Cases.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/12/2018. Replies due by 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan E. Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand filed by Robinson Rancheria. Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/12/2018. Replies due by 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Press Release, #2 Exhibit 2. PPV Contract, #3 Exhibit 3. 12/14/2017 MDL Order, #4 Proposed Order)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robinson Rancheria identifying Corporate Parent No Corp. Parent for Robinson Rancheria. (Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 12 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 22, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/18/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/18/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION For Extension of Time to Answer Otherwise Respond to the #1 Complaint filed by McKesson Corporation, Robinson Rancheria, Cardinal Health, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc. Teva pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Cephalon, INc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis, LLC Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Teva Pharaceutical Industries, Ltd, Janssen Pharaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, INc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., and Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/4/2018) Modified on 5/7/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/7/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related and Proposed Order filed by McKesson Corporation. Responses due by 5/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/3/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE and NOTICE to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal and Proof of Service)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 5/2/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Case from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-18-564739. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12310091). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson Rancheria v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Neema T. Sahni
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Represented By: Clara Jihye Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Rancheria
Represented By: Little Fawn Boland
Represented By: J. Nixon Daniel, III
Represented By: T. Roe Frazer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?