Center Point, Inc. v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Center Point, Inc.
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45921
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 54 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney S. Albert Wang filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Morris, Sean)
September 10, 2018 Filing 53 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 52 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 51 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 50 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 49 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 48 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 40 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Center Point, Inc.. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Center Point, Inc. (Daniel, J.)
August 8, 2018 Filing 36 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-02535. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 2, 2018 Filing 35 MDL TRANSFER ORDER, TRANSFERRING CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO. IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION, MDL. No. 2804. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 7/16/2018. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 33 CLERK'S NOTICE vacating the hearing re Plaintiffs' Motions to Remand and Defendants' Motions to Stay Proceedings scheduled for 7/12/2018. The Court will issue a written ruling. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE HEARING RE #19 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY (re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/19/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byCenter Point, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, #2 Exhibit 1. Settlement Agreement and Release, #3 Exhibit 2. Order Regarding State Court Coordination)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 29 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lori White, #2 Declaration of Rebecca Van Tassell, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/11/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 28 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #19 MOTION to Remand ) filed byPurdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jae) (Filed on 6/11/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 27 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation ) filed byCenter Point, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Little Fawn Boland, #2 Exhibit 1. MDL 2804 Order, 12-14-2017, #3 Exhibit 2. MDL 2804 Order, 2-16-2018, #4 Exhibit 3. MDL 2804 Order, 5-17-2018)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/11/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 6, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand . Motion Hearing set for 7/5/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by McKesson Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. Responses due by 6/19/2018. Replies due by 6/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Shafroth, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 6/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 25 Re-notice of Motion Hearing re #19 MOTION to Remand filed by Center Point, Inc.. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 6/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
June 5, 2018 Filing 24 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 23 Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/31/2018. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/30/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 05/29/2018. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand filed by Center Point, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2018 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Responses due by 6/11/2018. Replies due by 6/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Press Release, #2 Exhibit 2. PPV Contract, #3 Exhibit 3. 3/7/18 MDL Order, #4 Exhibit 4. 5/17/18 MDL Order, #5 Proposed Order)(Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/26/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Center Point, Inc. (Boland, Little Fawn) (Filed on 5/25/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2018 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2018.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 5/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney, #2 Standing Order of All Judges)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/17/18. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/16/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc re #9 Certificate of Interested Entities, #8 Notice (Other), #11 Notice (Other), #10 Certificate of Interested Entities (Lee, Jae) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Lee, Jae) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc (Lee, Jae) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 9 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc; Other Affiliate Purdue Holdings L.P. for Purdue Pharma L.P.. (Lee, Jae) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Lee, Jae) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by McKesson Corporation.. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/14/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by McKesson Corporation. (Shafroth, Nathan) (Filed on 5/4/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Notice to Plaintiff of Removal and Proof of Service)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 5/2/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/14/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by McKesson Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Case from San Francisco Superior. Their case number is CGC-18-564833. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12310841). Filed byMcKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shin, Clara) (Filed on 4/27/2018) [Transferred from cand on 8/8/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center Point, Inc. v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Nathan E. Shafroth
Represented By: Clara Jihye Shin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Sean O. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Jae Hong Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Point, Inc.
Represented By: Little Fawn Boland
Represented By: J. Nixon Daniel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?