Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., John Does 1-100, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Walmart Inc., CVS Health Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op45932
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
County: Out Of State
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 47 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 46 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 45 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 44 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 10, 2018 Filing 43 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 42 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 5, 2018 Filing 41 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
September 4, 2018 Filing 40 Opinion and Order denying #15 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court (Related Doc #15 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 9/4/18.(P,R)
August 30, 2018 Filing 39 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 37 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 36 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 30, 2018 Filing 35 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 34 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 33 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 32 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 31 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 13, 2018 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 8/13/2018, answer due 10/12/2018 filed on behalf of Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians (Daniel, J.)
August 9, 2018 Filing 29 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Wisconsin Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00286. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 7, 2018 Filing 28 Certified Copy of Transfer Order. Case closed. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 27 Transfer Order (Copy). Signed by S. Vance, MDL Panel Chair on 8/1/18. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION & ORDER granting #18 McKesson Corporation's Motion to Stay. Litigation is STAYED pending the JPML's decision on Lac Courte Oreilles's motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. The parties must notify this court within three days of the JPML's decision on the motion to vacate the conditional transfer order. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/25/18. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 25 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians re: #18 Motion to Stay, filed by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Minutes of Teleconference and Scheduling Order, Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Regarding Remands, Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order, Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division, #4 Exhibit 4 - Associated Cases, #5 Exhibit 5 - Case Management Order One, Northern District of Ohio, Eastern Division) (Frazer, Thomas) Modified on 5/22/2018: Added exhibit descriptions. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 24 Brief in Reply by Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians in Support of #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement and Release) (Frazer, Thomas) Modified on 5/22/2018: Added exhibit description. Detailed e-mail sent to counsel. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 23 Disregard. Filed in the wrong case. Modified on 5/21/2018 (jls). [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Mary Jane Bass for Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. (Bass, Mary Jane) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by James Nixon Daniel, III for Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. (Daniel, James) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by John Richard Zoesch, III for Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. (Zoesch, John) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 16, 2018 Filing 19 Declaration of Lori White filed by Defendant McKesson Corporation re: #15 Motion to Remand to State Court. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 18 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Likely Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendant McKesson Corporation. Response due 5/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Conditional Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order) (Wojciak, Paul) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 15, 2018 Filing 17 Brief in Opposition by Defendant McKesson Corporation re: #15 Motion to Remand to State Court, filed by Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vendor Contract, #2 Exhibit 2 - See #19 .) (Wojciak, Paul) Modified on 5/16/2018. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Brown, Dustin) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
May 1, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #15 Emergency MOTION TO REMAND to State Court. Brief in Opposition due 5/15/2018. Brief in Reply due 5/21/2018. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION TO REMAND to State Court by Plaintiff Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians. Brief in Opposition due 5/21/2018. Brief in Reply due 5/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Department of Justice Release, #2 Exhibit 2 - Pharmaceutical Prime Vendor Contract (Two pages numbered 96. Second page is blank.), #3 Exhibit 3 - Collective Exhibit of Cases and Other Citations) (Frazer, Thomas) Modified on 5/1/2018. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint; granting #13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/27/2018. (arw) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 13 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Neill, Matthew) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (O'Neill, Matthew) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew W. O'Neill for Defendants Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (O'Neill, Matthew) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by the Pharmacy Defendants, by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wooley, James) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 9 Notice by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. of Party Name Correction. (Wooley, James) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Wooley, James) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by James Russell Wooley for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Wooley, James) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Distributor Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/26/18. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Distributor Defendants, by Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Brown, Dustin) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Dustin Brett Brown for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Brown, Dustin) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Lee Johanningmeier for Defendant Cardinal Health, Inc. (Johanningmeier, Joshua) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Wojciak, Paul) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sawyer County, case number 2018CV000040. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2231404), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Circuit Court documents, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wojciak, Paul) Modified on 4/19/2018 (jat). [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]
April 19, 2018 Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jat) [Transferred from wiwd on 8/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians v. McKesson Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Paul William Wojciak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Dustin Brett Brown
Represented By: Joshua Lee Johanningmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: James R. Wooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lac Courte Oreilles Band Of Lake Superior Chippewa Indians
Represented By: Mary Jane Bass
Represented By: Andrew Adams, III
Represented By: Dyllan Evan Linehan
Represented By: Thomas Roe Frazer, II
Represented By: J. Nixon Daniel, III
Represented By: John Richard Zoesch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?