Jefferson County v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Jefferson County
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Cardinal Health Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., John and Jane Doe(s), Purdue Pharma Inc., Actavis plc, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis Inc, Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. doing business as Peytons Phoenix, Richard S. Sackler, Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Beverly Sackler, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Mortimer D.A. Sackler, Theresa Sackler, Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family, David A. Sackler, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Rhodes Technologies Inc., Smith Drug Company, West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Ilene Sackler Lefcourt, KVK-Tech, Inc., Kathe A. Sackler, SpecGX LLC, Jonathan D. Sackler, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Rhodes Technologies, The Kroger Co., Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc., Walgreen Co, CVS RX Services, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy Inc. and Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op46023
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2021 Filing 31 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. a/k/a Walgreen Co; Walmart, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; CVS Pharmacy Inc.; CVS RX Services, Inc.; and Rite Aid Corporation. Filed by Jefferson County. (Ko, David)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Kroger Limited Partnership I waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; Kroger Limited Partnership II waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019; The Kroger Co. waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Ko, David)
October 1, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) re Smith Drug Company filed by Jefferson County. (Ko, David)
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
May 28, 2019 Filing 27 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Richard S. Sackler; Jonathan D. Sackler; Mortimer D.A. Sackler; Kathe A. Sackler; Ilene Sackler Lefcourt; Beverly Sackler; Theresa Sackler; David A. Sackler; Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.; Rhodes Technologies Inc.; Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.; and Rhodes Technologies. Filed by Jefferson County. (Ko, David)
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Thomas E. Rice, Jr filed by on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas)
March 15, 2019 Filing 24 Amended complaint Short Form for Supplementing Complaint and Amending Defendants against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., John and Jane Doe(s), Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., SpecGX LLC, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, KVK-Tech, Inc., Anda, Inc., Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc., Smith Drug Company and adding new party defendant(s) SpecGX LLC; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.; Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC; KVK-Tech, Inc.; Anda, Inc.; Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; The Kroger Co.; Kroger Limited Partnership I; Kroger Limited Partnership II; Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. d/b/a/ Peytons Phoenix; & Smith Drug Company. Filed by Jefferson County. (Ko, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Jefferson County. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of Jefferson County (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/12/2018, answer due 12/11/2018 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Loeser, Derek)
September 4, 2018 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western. Case number 3:18-cv-05661. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 MDL 2804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 51); in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; District of Northern Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 11/5/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/13/2018, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., and Watson Laboratories, Inc. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (SP) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 1:17-md-02804, by Plaintiff Jefferson County. (Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., John and Jane Does 1 through 100, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5434087), filed by Jefferson County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Loeser, Derek) [Transferred from wawd on 9/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jefferson County v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smiths Food & Drug Centers, Inc. doing business as Peytons Phoenix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortimer D.A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theresa Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West-Ward Pharmaceutical Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe A. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Technologies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jefferson County
Represented By: Daniel P. Mensher
Represented By: Erika M. Keech
Represented By: Philip Hunsucker
Represented By: David J. Ko
Represented By: Lynn L. Sarko
Represented By: Derek W. Loeser
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Alison Gaffney
Represented By: Alison S. Gaffney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?