Bacon County, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Bacon County, Georgia
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Mallinckrodt LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Cephalon Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op46105
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
November 6, 2018 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 10/19/2018, answer due 12/18/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
November 1, 2018 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Mallinckrodt LLC waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 10/3/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 8, 2018 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 8, 2018 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Noramco Inc waiver sent on 10/4/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Purdue Pharma L.P. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Purdue Pharma Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Bacon County, Georgia. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/1/2018, answer due 11/30/2018 filed on behalf of Bacon County, Georgia (Tate, Mark)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 5:18-cv-00069. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-56)(certified copy) Transferring Case to the Northern District of Ohio for Multidistrict Litigation. Certified copy of the Docket. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 9/27/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-56)(copy) that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio for the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 9/27/2018. (csr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2018: #1 Correct Attachment) (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/19/2018. (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2442843, (csr) [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Provide Governmental Plaintiff Fact Sheet and Brief in Support thereof, filed by Bacon County, Georgia. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order).REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) Modified on 9/11/2018 (csr). [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Bacon County, Georgia. $400.00 Filing Fee Paid - Receipt Number: 113J-2442843. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet).(csr) [Transferred from gasd on 9/27/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon County, Georgia v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bacon County, Georgia
Represented By: Mark A. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?