Belcher et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Belcher and Ella Louise Johnson
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., McKesson Corporation, Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Alyssa Noble, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Russell Portenoy, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Perry Fine, Cephalon, Inc., Scott Fishman, Purdue Pharma Inc, Magna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutical Inc., AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Actavis Inc, Richie Enterprises, L.L.C., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lynn Webster
Case Number: 1:2018op46143
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Eastern. Case number 6:18-cv-00246. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Note: re #13 Conditional Transfer Order: Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio via CM/ECF. (MRS) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 58 from NDOH re: Case Transfer to the MDL Panel pursuant to CTO 58 filed in MDL Case Number: 2804. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR (MRS) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 12 INFORMATION COPY OF MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-58): MDL No. 2804 (MRS) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rhonda Belcher, Ella Louise Johnson (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Biggerstaff, Ryan) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time [R. #8 ] is GRANTED; 2. Defendants SHALL FILE their motions, answers, or otherwise responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint within (30) days of the decision of the JPML regarding transfer of this matter to the MDL proceeding; 3. Defendants' Motion to Stay this Matter [R. #9 ] is GRANTED; 4. This matter is STAYED pending a determination of the JPML; and 5. The parties SHALL FILE a status report no later than (180) days from the date of entry of this order explaining any relevant developments. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 10/02/2018.(KJA)cc: COR via US Mail to Cecily J. McLeod, Chad Shultz, Charles C. Lifland, Donna Welch, J. Matthew Donohue, Joseph L. Franco, Kateryna Stupnevich, Martin Roth, Melanie S. Carter, Terry M. Henry, and Timothy Knapp. Modified text on 10/3/2018 (KJA). [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum Supporting Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A_Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit B_KY Stay Order, #4 Exhibit C_Knott Stay Order, #5 Exhibit D_Pike Stay Order, #6 Exhibit E_Floyd Stay Order, #7 Exhibit F_WI Stay Order, #8 Exhibit G_CA Stay Order, #9 Exhibit H_CA Stay Order, #10 Exhibit I_IL Stay Order, #11 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Phillips, Jeffrey) Modified text and filers on 10/2/2018 (KJA). [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time by McKesson Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., and AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Notices for Potential Tag Along Actions, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Phillips, Jeffrey) Modified text and filers on 10/2/2018 (KJA). [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International PLC. (Benvenuti, Robert) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (KJA). [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Notice in Support of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. MDL Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2. Process Papers Served on Endo, #3 Exhibit 3. Mayfield v London Womens Care)(Benvenuti, Robert) Modified to further describe on 10/1/2018 (KJA). [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Richie Enterprises, L.L.C.. (Cook, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Richie Enterprises, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cook, Matthew) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Clerk's Note: re #1 Notice of Removal. MDL Panel notified of possible tag along case (MDL No. 2804) by e-mail with a copy of notice of removal and docket sheet. (cc: SKV) (KJA) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJA) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (KJA) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Leslie County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00134. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4176000), filed by McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record)(KJA) [Transferred from kyed on 10/12/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belcher et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Belcher
Represented By: Gary C. Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Biggerstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ella Louise Johnson
Represented By: Gary C. Johnson
Represented By: Ryan Biggerstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J. Cosgrove
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Charles M. Pritchett, Jr.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lori E. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: J. Matthew Donohue
Represented By: Joseph L. Franco
Represented By: Christopher M. Mussler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa Noble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Holly R. Iaccarino
Represented By: Robert James Benvenuti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Portenoy
Represented By: R. Kent Westberry
Represented By: Bridget M. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M. Pritchett, Jr.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lori E. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perry Fine
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Angela Marie Richie
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Melanie S. Carter
Represented By: Terry M. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fishman
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Angela Marie Richie
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Charles M. Pritchett, Jr.
Represented By: Mark S. Cheffo
Represented By: Lori E. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kateryna Stupnevich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Perry M. Bentley
Represented By: Monica Hobson Braun
Represented By: Steven Brian Loy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Holly R. Iaccarino
Represented By: Robert James Benvenuti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc
Represented By: Martin L. Roth
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp
Represented By: Donna M. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richie Enterprises, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew P. Cook
Represented By: Thomas N. Kerrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Webster
Represented By: Chad A. Shultz
Represented By: Angela Marie Richie
Represented By: Cecily J. McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?