Doyle v. Actavis LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erin Doyle, Stephanie Howell, Michelle Frost and Ashley Dawn Marie Poe
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis LLC, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Cephalon, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc., Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., McKesson Corporation, Allergan PLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Indivior, Inc., Prescription Supply, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, HBC Service Company, Actavis plc, Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Health Mart Systems, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a/ Actavis, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walmart, Inc. or Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walgreen Co., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., CVS RX Services, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, Watson Pharma, Inc., Noramco, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, Costco Wholesale Corporation, Mallinckrodt, PLC, SpecGX LLC, Miami-Luken, Inc. and H.D. Smith Holding Company
Case Number: 1:2018op46327
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 44 Attorney Appearance by Charles M. Silver filed by on behalf of Michelle Frost, Stephanie Howell, Ashley Dawn Marie Poe. (Silver, Charles)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Assertio Therapeutic's Motion for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #43 ). The Court will first decide the motion for class certification before receiving any motions for summary judgment. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/11/20.(P,R)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying Assertio Therapeutic's Motion for leave to file under seal Motion for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment (Related Doc #42 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/11/20.(P,R)
May 8, 2020 Filing 43 Motion for leave Assertio Therapeutic's Motion for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doyle-Frost MSJ & App'x-REDACTED, #2 Exhibit Artz Motion for Summary Judgment & App'x-REDACTED, #3 Proposed Order)(Sadler, Kevin)
May 8, 2020 Filing 42 Motion for leave to file under seal Motion for Leave to File Motions for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sadler, Kevin) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (P,R).
April 7, 2020 Filing 41 Third Amended complaint against Actavis Elizabeth, LLC, Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan PLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, CVS Indiana, LLC, CVS RX Services, Inc., Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Costco Wholesale Corporation, Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., H.D. Smith Holding Company, H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC, H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company, HBC Service Company, Health Mart Systems, Inc., Indivior, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, McKesson Corporation, Miami-Luken, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Prescription Supply, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., SpecGX LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc. or Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a/ Actavis, Inc. and adding new party plaintiff(s) Ashley Dawn Marie Poe. Filed by Michelle Frost, Ashley Dawn Marie Poe. (Dann, Marc)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order granting Motion for reconsideration of Ashley Poe's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Class Representative. Related Doc #39 . Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/3/20.(P,R)
April 1, 2020 Filing 39 Motion for reconsideration of Ashley Poe's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Class Representative filed by Plaintiff Michelle Frost. (Dann, Marc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 38 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Indivior, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; McKesson Corporation waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Elizabeth, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Kadian, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Actavis Totowa, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; HBC Service Company waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Miami-Luken, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2019, answer due 12/31/2019; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a/ Actavis, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Costco Wholesale Corporation waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; CVS Health Corporation waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; CVS Indiana, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; CVS RX Services, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Noramco, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; H.D. Smith Holding Company waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Walmart, Inc. or Wal-Mart Stores East, LP waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Mallinckrodt, LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Mallinckrodt, PLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Prescription Supply, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; SpecGX LLC waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Walgreen Co. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Health Mart Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019; Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. waiver sent on 10/23/2019, answer due 12/22/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Brustowicz, Celeste)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] - Ashley Poe's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Class Representative #32 is denied. The Court finds the Motion is untimely under Rule 24 and in light of the Courts previous orders regarding extensions of time for amendment of class action complaints. The Court further denies as moot #36 Defendants' Motion to seal unredacted versions of the Opposition. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/20/20.(P,R)
March 13, 2020 Filing 37 Attorney Appearance by Emily S. Ullman filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Ullman, Emily)
March 10, 2020 Filing 36 Motion to seal document unredacted versions of the Opposition to Ashley Rachel Dawn Poe's Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff and Class Representative and exhibits filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Declaration of Emily Ullman, #2 Exhibit A--Poe Sealing Emails)(Ullman, Emily)
March 6, 2020 Filing 35 Reply in support of #32 Motion to intervene as a party as a Plaintiff and Class Representative (Corrected) filed by Michelle Frost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Marc E. Dann)(Dann, Marc)
March 6, 2020 Filing 34 Filing Error - Attorney to Refile Corrected Document. Reply in support of #32 Motion to intervene as a party as a Plaintiff and Class Representative filed by Michelle Frost. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Marc E. Dann)(Dann, Marc) Modified on 3/6/2020 (K,K).
March 3, 2020 Filing 33 Opposition to #32 Motion to intervene as a party as a Plaintiff and Class Representative filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Watson Laboratories Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Declaration of Emily Ullman, #2 Exhibit A Sept. 28, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit B Doyle Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit C Feb. 6, 2020 Frost Email, #5 Exhibit D Feb. 6, 2020 Howell Email, #6 Exhibit E Poe Fact Sheet, #7 Exhibit F Poe Interrogatory Responses, #8 Exhibit G Poe Records)(Lynch, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to intervene as a party as a Plaintiff and Class Representative filed by Plaintiff Michelle Frost. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Complaint (Proposed) Intervening Class Action Complaint, #3 Proposed Order)(Dann, Marc)
February 7, 2020 Filing 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by Plaintiff Stephanie Howell. (P,R) .
November 4, 2019 Filing 30 Second Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) Michelle Frost and Stephanie Howell. Filed by Michelle Frost, Stephanie Howell. (Dann, Marc)
October 22, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Compliance With Scheduling Order Doc. 2738 - NAS Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets and Responsive Documents filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brustowicz, Celeste)
October 18, 2019 Filing 28 Notice of Compliance With Scheduling Order Doc. 2738 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Expert CV, #2 Expert CV, #3 Expert CV)(Brustowicz, Celeste)
October 17, 2019 Filing 27 Notice of Compliance With Scheduling Order Doc 2738 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Brustowicz, Celeste)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance by Sara E. Silva filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Silva, Sara)
July 17, 2019 Filing 25 Attorney Appearance by Maria R. Durant filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Durant, Maria)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 Attorney Appearance by Safa W. Osmani filed by on behalf of Indivior, Inc.. (Osmani, Safa)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order granting in part Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider (Related Doc # 1797 in 1:17md2804). Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify due 8/23/19, Defendants' single, joint response due 9/23/19, Plaintiffs' reply due 10/7/19. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/11/19. (P,R)
July 3, 2019 Filing 22 Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 20 Supplemental Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) DEPOMED, INC.; MALLINCKRODT LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; SPECGX LLC; INSYS THERAPEUTICS, INC.; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.; PAR PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANIES, INC.; NORAMCO, INC.; INDIVIOR, INC.; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION; RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC.; RITE AID CORP.; WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE, INC.; WALGREEN EASTERN CO.; WALGREEN CO.; WAL-MART INC. f/k/a WALMART STORES, INC.; MIAMI-LUKEN, INC.; COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION; LINDEN CARE, LLC; THE KROGER CO.; H.D. SMITH, LLC; H.D. SMITH HOLDINGS, LLC; H.D. SMITH HOLDING COMPANY; ANDA, INC.; RICHARD S. SACKLER; JONATHON D. SACKLER; MORTIMER D.A. SACKLER; KATHER A. SACKLER; ILENE SACKLER LEFCOURT; BEVERLY SACKLER; THERESA SACKLER; DAVID A. SACKLER; RHODES TECHNOLOGIES; RHODES TECHNOLOGIES INC.; RHODES PHARACEUTICALS L.P.; RHODES PHARMACEUTICALS INC.; TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE RAYMOND SACKLER FAMILY; THE P.F. LABORATORIES, INC.. Filed by Erin Doyle. (Wussow, Stephen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 Attorney Appearance by Stephen Wussow filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wussow, Stephen)
January 16, 2019 Filing 18 Attorney Appearance by Celeste Brustowicz filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Brustowicz, Celeste)
December 13, 2018 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-00719. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 13, 2018 Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 TRANSFER ORDER- MDL No. 2804: It is ORDERED that this action is transferred to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel - Brian J Laliberte substituting for Alana Valle Tanoury as to Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Service by Plaintiff Erin Doyle. (Attachments: #1 MDL Motion for Transfer of Actions, #2 MDL Brief in Support of Motion, #3 MDL Schedule of Actions) (er) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to respond to Plts' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/31/2018. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Also sent via email to counsel listed on complaint.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Erin Doyle. Content inside included a copy of Doc. #10 . (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 30, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/1/2018. Manufacturer Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendant Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Distributor Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/26/2018. (sln)(This document sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification. Also sent via email to counsel listed on complaint.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Holzhall, Vincent) Modified text on 7/26/2018 (jlk). [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant McKesson Corporation. (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana Valle Tanoury for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Tanoury, Alana) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 24, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent I Holzhall for Defendant McKesson Corporation (Holzhall, Vincent) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The judges agree that this case and case number 2:17-cv-662 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Judge Michael H. Watson on 7/23/2018. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants originally filed in Ross County Court of Common Pleas on 5/9/2018 by Erin Doyle. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo International plc identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc... (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Ross County, Ohio, case number 18CI000201 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6527565), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle v. Actavis LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Christopher C. Hollon
Represented By: Erin E. Rhinehart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Represented By: Brian K. Murphy
Represented By: James B. Hadden
Represented By: Joseph F. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Tera N. Coleman
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Daniel J. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Alana V. Tanoury
Represented By: Vincent I. Holzhall
Represented By: Brian J. Laliberte
Represented By: Mark H. Lynch
Represented By: Emily S. Ullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Represented By: Maria R. Durant
Represented By: Safa W. Osmani
Represented By: Sara E. Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prescription Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBC Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis plc
Represented By: Andrea B. Daloia
Represented By: John R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC, f/k/a Actavis, Inc., f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Mart Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a/ Actavis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc. or Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depomed, Inc. n/k/a Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin M. Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS RX Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy West Feinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Luken, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Doyle
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Stephen Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Howell
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Charles M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Frost
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Charles M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Dawn Marie Poe
Represented By: Marc E. Dann
Represented By: Charles M. Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?