Stark County, Ohio Board of County Commissioners et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Purdue Pharma, Inc., The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Stark County, John D. Ferrero, Stark County, Ohio Board of County Commissioners, State of Ohio, John D. Ferrero, City of Massillon, City of Canton and City of Alliance
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Jane Does 1-50, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., SpecGX LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P., Mallinckrodt, PLC, Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Kathe Sackler, Allergan, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis LLC, Actavis Kadian LLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Jonathan Sackler, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Richard Sackler, Allergan Finance, LLC, Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018op46340
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 26 Attorney Appearance Notice of Appearance by Linda J. Singer filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 25 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 24 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 23 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Warner Chilcott Company, LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 20 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Sales, LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 19 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 18 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Totowa LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis South Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc. waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Kadian LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Actavis Elizabeth LLC waiver sent on 6/3/2019, answer due 8/2/2019 filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Singer, Linda)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Stipulation Service Stipulation filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #7 .(Singer, Linda)
April 1, 2019 Party Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Actavis Totowa LLC, Allergan, Inc., Actavis Kadian LLC, Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC, Actavis LLC, Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC, Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Richard Sackler, Kathe Sackler and Jonathan Sackler added. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Singer, Linda)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 Amended complaint against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.; Watson Laboratories, Inc.; Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.; Actavis Totowa LLC; Allergan, Inc.; Actavis Kadian LLC; Actavis South Atlantic LLC; Actavis Elizabeth LLC; Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.; Allergan plc f/k/a Actavis plc; Actavis LLC; Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Allergan Finance, LLC; Allergan Sales, LLC; Allergan USA, Inc.; Warner Chilcott Company, LLC; Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC; Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.; and Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.; Richard Sackler; Kathe Sackler; Jonathan Sackler. Filed by State of Ohio, Stark County, Ohio Board of County Commissioners, John D. Ferrero. (Singer, Linda)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 1/16/2019 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #3 . (T,Je)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on (date not legible) from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #4 . (T,Je) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Additional Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 1/7/2019 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas) (T,Je).
January 3, 2019 Filing 4 Original state court record received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas. Original documents mailed back with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Service Documents, #5 Acknowledgment Letter to Stark County Clerk of Court) (S,HR)
January 2, 2019 Filing 3 State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018cv2231. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Court) (T,Je)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Stark County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CV02230 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9057681. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-2804. Filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Service Papers, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stark County, Ohio Board of County Commissioners et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SpecGX LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Carole S. Rendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insys Therapeutics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathe Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sackler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Ohio ex rel. Prosecuting Attorney of Stark County, John D. Ferrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stark County, Ohio Board of County Commissioners
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Ferrero, Jr.
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Ohio
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Ferrero, Jr.
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Ferrero
Represented By: Stephan P. Babik
Represented By: Elizabeth Shively Boatwright
Represented By: Adam D. Fuller
Represented By: Donald W. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: John D. Ferrero, Jr.
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Massillon
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Canton
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Alliance
Represented By: Linda J. Singer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?