Malik et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement

Plaintiff: David Malik and Esperanza Pacheo Padilla
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2019cv00059
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying as moot Plaintiff's Motion to lift stay (Related Doc #3 ). See Order of January 9, 2019. The stay remained in effect only until appropriations funding the federal government were made available. Funding has been made available. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/26/2019.(R,Sh)
January 31, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to lift stay filed by David Malik, Esperanza Pacheo Padilla. (Markovich, Anna)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/9/2019. (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, no summons issued. (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (S,SR)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9086579. Filed by David Malik, Esperanza Pacheo Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Confirmation) (Malik, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malik et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Malik
Represented By: Anna Markovich
Represented By: David B. Malik
Represented By: Sara M. Gedeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esperanza Pacheo Padilla
Represented By: Anna Markovich
Represented By: David B. Malik
Represented By: Sara M. Gedeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?