International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00177
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Case transferred from Ohio Northern has been opened in District of Nebraska as case 8:19-cv-00050 (S,HR)
January 31, 2019 Case electronically transferred to District of Nebraska on 1/31/2019 (Related document(s) #4 ). (H,SP)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Transfer. For the reasons stated in the Order, the Court hereby GRANTS the Unopposed Motion and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to transfer the case to the U.S. Court for the District of Nebraska. Additionally, the teleconference presently scheduled on January 30, 2019 is hereby CANCELLED. Related document #3 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 1/29/2019. (W,CM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion to transfer venue filed by Petitioner International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. (McKinley, Shawn)
January 25, 2019 IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 01:00 PM in to be held before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (W,CM)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,SR)
January 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (S,SR)
January 24, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (S,SR)
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to enforce awards of the public law board no. 7861 against Union Pacific Railroad Company. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9108978. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Final Award, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (McKinley, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Represented By: Shawn M. McKinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?