Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00186
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Parker
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security via the US Attorney's Office on 2/5/2019, upon the Attorney General and Regional Chief Counsel via FedEx on 2/6/19 filed on behalf of Michael Brown Related document(s) #7 . (P,WL)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, Initial Order and Magistrate Consent Package issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285). (D,JJ)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (D,JJ)
January 31, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 1/31/2019. (D,JJ)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 1/31/2019.(D,JJ)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Order (non-document) staying case during the government shut down. The stay remains in effect until such time as appropriations funding the federal government are made available. See #General Order 2019-1 for details. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 1/25/2019. (S,SR)
January 25, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/25/2019. (S,SR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (S,SR)
January 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (S,SR)
January 25, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (S,SR)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Compliance filed by Michael Brown. (Braun, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Michael Brown. (Braun, Katherine)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Appeals Council Denial, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 USM-285, #7 USM-285, #8 USM-285) (Braun, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brown
Represented By: Katherine M. Braun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?