Wilson v. Menorah Park Foundation et al

Plaintiff: Michael Wilson
Defendant: Menorah Park Foundation, Jamie Herbst and Rick Martin
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order scheduling mediation conference to be held on 5/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10A before Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman Jr. Confidential mediation statements must be delivered to chambers no later than 5/17/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 3/21/19. (D,Ky)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties will exchange pre-discovery disclosures by 3/14/19. Discovery due by 8/5/2019. Parties to be Joined and/or Amend the Pleadings by 3/25/19. Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2019. After discussion with the parties, the court determined that Alternative Dispute Resolution would be useful. The case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Baughman to conduct a mediation to be accomplished by June 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 3/18/2019. (W,CM)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(F) and L.R. 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Jamie Herbst, Rick Martin, Menorah Park Foundation. (Caspary, Christopher)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 3/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/12/2019. (R,Sh)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Jamie Herbst, Rick Martin, Menorah Park Foundation. (Dileno, Jon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Menorah Park Foundation. (Dileno, Jon)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
February 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
February 4, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas, case number CV-19-909067 Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9129474. Filed by Jamie Herbst, Rick Martin, Menorah Park Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint in State Court, #2 Exhibit B - Summons Menorah Park, #3 Exhibit C - Summons Martin, #4 Exhibit D - Summons Herbst, #5 Exhibit E - State Court Docket, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dileno, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Menorah Park Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wilson
Represented By: Barry R. Murner
Represented By: Corinne A. Huntley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menorah Park Foundation
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Herbst
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Martin
Represented By: Christopher D. Caspary
Represented By: Jon M. Dileno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?