McCarty v. Wellington Exempted Village Schools Board of Education

Plaintiff: Roberta McCarty
Defendant: Wellington Exempted Village Schools Board of Education and Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv00274
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 5/8/2019 at 03:00 PM at Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/25/2019. (R,Sh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, filed by Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education. (Watts, Patrick)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education on 2/28/2019, filed on behalf of Roberta McCarty Related document(s) #1 , #2 . (W,CM)
February 25, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70060100000537482326. (W,Jo)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to withdraw as attorney, attorney Brad M. Zebedis removed from case. (Related Doc #4 ). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 2/21/2019.(R,Sh)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Motion by Brad M. Zebedis to withdraw as attorney with memorandum in support filed by Plaintiff Roberta McCarty. (Reight, Rachel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Motion by Brad M. Zebedis to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff Roberta McCarty. (Reight, Rachel)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
February 6, 2019 Notice to Attorney Brad M. Zebedis. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
February 6, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
February 6, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Wellington Exempted Village Schools Board of Education. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9132472.. Filed by Roberta McCarty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Reight, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty v. Wellington Exempted Village Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Exempted Village Schools Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Exempted Village School District Board of Education
Represented By: Patrick M. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta McCarty
Represented By: Rachel M. Reight
Represented By: Brad M. Zebedis
Represented By: Kathleen K. McKinley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?