Canitia v. Nestle USA, Inc.

Plaintiff: Erin Canitia
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00299
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/15/19 that plaintiff shall identify experts by 4/1/19 and defendant shall identify experts by 4/22/19. (D,MA)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 3/15/19. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be joined and pleadings amended by 3/13/19. Dispositive motions to be filed by 5/28/19 with responses due 6/10/19 and replies due 6/17/19. All discovery to be completed by 8/12/19. Status conference set for 5/14/19 at 12:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 9/4/19 at 4:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is assigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 9/9/19 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Proposed Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B: Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C: Witness List)(D,MA)
March 15, 2019 Filing 14 Minutes of case management conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 3/13/19. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 1 hr.) (D,MA)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney's fees itemization filed by Erin Canitia. (Breedlove, Trisha) Modified on 3/15/2019 (L,Ja).
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/26/19 denying plaintiff's counsel's motion to excuse personal attendance at the 3/13/19 conference. (Related Doc. #11 ) (D,MA)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to excuse appearance of Attorney Fred Bean filed by Plaintiff Erin Canitia. (Breedlove, Trisha)
February 25, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) And Local Rule 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Erin Canitia. (Breedlove, Trisha)
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Nestle USA, Inc. (Brosky, Gilbert)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Discovery Protocol Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/11/19. (D,MA)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 2/11/19 setting a conference for 3/13/19 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1)(D,MA)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 2/11/19. (D,MA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
February 8, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
February 8, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (B,R)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Nestle USA, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Brosky, Gilbert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Service of Notice of Removal filed by Nestle USA, Inc. (Brosky, Gilbert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Nestle Holdings, Inc. for Nestle USA, Inc. filed by Nestle USA, Inc.. (Brosky, Gilbert)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 909329 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9138266.. Filed by Nestle USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint) (Brosky, Gilbert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canitia v. Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Canitia
Represented By: Frederick M. Bean
Represented By: Trisha M. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie A. Valdez
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Gilbert P. Brosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?