Williams v. OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Xhantiana Williams
Defendant: OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00405
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2661
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of Dismissal. This matter is settled and dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. The Court retains jurisdiction to ensure that the settlement agreement is executed. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/9/2019. (K,K)
April 9, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Case Management Conference held on 4/9/2019. Case settled. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 2 hours. (K,K)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Staci K. Rotman for OMNOVA Solutions, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #11 ). Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/1/2019.(K,K)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for attorney Staci K. Rotman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9229456, with Affidavit, Certificate of Admission and Certificate of Good Standing filed by Defendant OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. (Shoop, Meredith)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Initial Disclosures filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. (Shoop, Meredith)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Revised Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) & LR 16.3(b) parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. Related document(s) #7 , #6 .(Shoop, Meredith)
March 22, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Disclosures filed by Xhantiana Williams. (Levine, Bradley)
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and LR 16.3(b) - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) #6 .(Shoop, Meredith)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/9/2019 at 02:30 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 4/5/2019. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/5/2019. (K,K)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. (Shoop, Meredith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
February 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
February 25, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. (Shoop, Meredith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.. Related document(s) #1 . (Shoop, Meredith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV-19-910280 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9164472. Filed by OMNOVA Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons & Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal of Civil Action to USDC) (Shoop, Meredith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xhantiana Williams
Represented By: Stephan I. Voudris
Represented By: Bradley Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OMNOVA Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Meredith C. Shoop
Represented By: Staci K. Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?