Buncher Company v. DCEH Education Holdings, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: The Buncher Company and Buncher Company
Defendant: The Dream Center Foundation, DCEH Education Holdings, LLC and Dream Center Foundation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00447
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Parker
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order With the concurrence of Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker, the assigned magistrate judge on the related case (1:19cv145), and the approval of Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan, this case shall be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker for full pretrial supervision. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster, Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker and Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 3/14/2019. (K,K)
March 14, 2019 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
March 7, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, Judge Donald C. Nugent terminated. (B,R)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Dan A. Polster for all further proceedings as a related case to case no. 1:19 cv 145. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 3/07/19. (R,JM)
February 28, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (S,HR)
February 28, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (S,HR)
February 28, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case. (S,HR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 Verified Complaint against DCEH Education Holdings, LLC and Dream Center Foundation. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9170812. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:19-cv-00145-DAP. Filed by Buncher Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement, #3 Exhibit B - Statement of Account) (Roach, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buncher Company v. DCEH Education Holdings, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dream Center Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCEH Education Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dream Center Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Buncher Company
Represented By: Jared S. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buncher Company
Represented By: Jared S. Roach
Represented By: Eric A. Schaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?