Lowe v. ShieldMark, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Lowe and InSite Solutions, LLC
Defendant: ShieldMark, Inc., Advanced Plastics, Inc. and Crown Equipment Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00748
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 37 Joint Status Report Regarding Post-Grant Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
June 24, 2020 Filing 36 Joint Status Report Regarding Post-Grant Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
April 23, 2020 Filing 35 Joint Status Report Regarding Post-Grant Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
February 18, 2020 Filing 34 Joint Status Report Regarding Post Grant Review filed by All Defendants. (Wernow, Howard)
February 3, 2020 LAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
January 10, 2020 IMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI)
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 Joint Status Report Regarding Post-Grant Review filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 Joint Status Report Regarding Post Grant Review filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc., Crown Equipment Corporation, ShieldMark, Inc.(an Ohio corporation). (Megley, Richard)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 8/29/19 granting defendants' unopposed motion to stay. The parties shall file a status report every 2 months and shall give notice when the Patent Trial and Appeal Board decides whether it will institute a post grant review. (Related Doc. #28 ) (D,MA)
August 28, 2019 Filing 30 Supplement to Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings pending post grant review - SUPPLEMENT TO THE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT SHIELDMARKS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING POST GRANT REVIEW, filed by ShieldMark, Inc.. Related document(s) #28 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition for PGR, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants Initial Invalidity & Unenforceability Contentions, #3 Exhibit C - US Patent No. 10,214,664, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Thomas R. Goecke, #5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Clifford A. Lowe)(Beoglos, Laura)
August 28, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings filed by ShieldMark, Inc.. Related document(s) #28 . (Beoglos, Laura)
August 27, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed Motion to stay proceedings pending post grant review filed by Defendant ShieldMark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Post Grant Review)(Beoglos, Laura)
August 8, 2019 Filing 27 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims of Defendant ShieldMark filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #24 . (Weber, Ray)
July 22, 2019 Filing 26 Answer to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Crown Equipment Corporation. Related document(s) #22 . (Wernow, Howard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 25 Answer to the Second Amended Complaint filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc. Related document(s) #22 . (Wernow, Howard)
July 22, 2019 Filing 24 Answer to Second Amended Complaint, Counterclaim against InSite Solutions, LLC and Clifford A. Lowe filed by ShieldMark, Inc.. (Related document(s) #22 ) (Wernow, Howard)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 7/10/19 granting the motion to appear pro hac vice of Attorney Richard B. Megley, Jr., on behalf of defendants. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc. #23 )(D,MA)
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Richard B. Megley, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9405356, filed by Defendant ShieldMark, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Wernow, Howard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 Second Amended complaint for patent infringement and false advertising against All Plaintiffs. Filed by InSite Solutions, LLC, Clifford A. Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 10,214,664, #2 Exhibit 2 - Internet advertising Mighty Line floor tape, #3 Exhibit 3 - Internet advertising by Crown Equipment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Internet advertising Mighty Line floor tape) (Weber, Ray)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Counterclaims of Defendant ShieldMark filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #13 . (Weber, Ray)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/12/19. IMPORTANT: The Court amends its 6/10/19 Case Management Plan/Order to correct a typographical error as follows: initial noninfringement contentions due 7/12/19. All other deadlines and hearings remain unchanged. (Related Doc. #19 ) (D,MA)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/10/19 that plaintiff shall identify experts by 7/29/19 and defendants shall identify experts by 8/12/19. (D,MA)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Case Management Conference Plan/Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/10/19. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be joined and pleadings amended by 7/8/19. Dispositive motions to be filed by 1/13/20 with responses due 1/27/20 and replies due 2/3/20. All discovery to be completed by 4/6/20. Status conference set for 9/5/19 at 2:00 p.m., and final pretrial conference set for 4/14/20 at 4:00 p.m., both in Chambers 18A. Jury trial is assigned on a two-week standby basis beginning 4/27/20 at 8:00 a.m., Courtroom 18A.IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order and to familiarize themselves with the deadlines imposed as not all deadlines are contained in the text of this docket entry. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Proposed Final Pretrial Order, #2 Appendix B: Exhibit List, #3 Appendix C: Witness List) (D,MA)
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 Minutes of case management conference before Judge James S. Gwin on 6/5/19. (Court Reporter: None; Time: 2 hr. 8 min.) (D,MA)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by InSite Solutions, LLC. (Weber, Ray)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to #11 Amended complaint, filed by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Wernow, Howard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 Answer to #11 Amended complaint, filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc. (Wernow, Howard)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to #11 Amended complaint, , Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs filed by ShieldMark, Inc. (Wernow, Howard)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/17/19 granting the parties' joint motion to continue the 5/23/19 case management conference due to scheduling conflicts. IMPORTANT: Said conference reset to 6/5/19 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. (Related Doc. #12 ) (D,MA)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 Joint Motion for extension of time to Reset the May 23,2019 Case Management Conference filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc., Crown Equipment Corporation, ShieldMark, Inc.. Related document(s) #10 . (Wernow, Howard)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 First Amended complaint for patent infringement with jury trial demanded against All Defendants and adding new party plaintiff(s) InSite Solutions, LLC. Filed by Clifford A. Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 10,214,664, #2 Exhibit 2 - Internet advertising Mighty Line floor tape, #3 Exhibit 3 - Internet advertising by Crown Equipment) (Weber, Ray)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/1/19 setting a conference for 5/23/19 at 8:30 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1)(D,MA)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 5/1/19. (D,MA)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/1/19 granting defendants' unopposed motion for an extension of time until 5/15/19 to file a response to plaintiff's complaint. The Court requires the filing of an answer. (Related Doc. #5 ) (D,MA)
April 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Wernow, Howard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ShieldMark, Inc.. (Wernow, Howard)
April 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time of 14 days until 05/15/2019 to answer filed by Advanced Plastics, Inc., Crown Equipment Corporation, ShieldMark, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Wernow, Howard)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Crown Equipment Corporation on 4/10/2019; ShieldMark, Inc. on 4/10/2019, Advanced Plastics, Inc. on 4/10/2019 no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Clifford A. Lowe Related document(s) #3 . (P,G)
April 15, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (Y,A)
April 15, 2019 Random Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
April 8, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Advanced Plastics, Inc., Receipt # 7000 0600 0027 0176 2525. Crown Equipment Corporation, Receipt # 7000 1670 0013 8525 0409. ShieldMark, Inc., Receipt # 7000 0600 0027 0176 2532 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (P,G)
April 4, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued for service upon Advanced Plastics, Inc., Crown Equipment Corporation, ShieldMark, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
April 4, 2019 FILING ERROR Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (Y,A) Modified on 4/17/2019 (Y,A).
April 4, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, (Y,A)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Weber, Ray)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand for patent infringement against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0647-9237640. Filed by Clifford A. Lowe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent 10,214,664, #2 Exhibit 2 - Internet advertising Mighty Line floor tape, #3 Exhibit 3 - Internet advertising by Crown Equipment, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Weber, Ray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowe v. ShieldMark, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford A. Lowe
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Represented By: Laura J. Gentilcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InSite Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ray L. Weber
Represented By: Laura J. Gentilcore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShieldMark, Inc.
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Laura L. Beoglos
Represented By: Joseph A. Sebolt
Represented By: Richard B. Megley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Plastics, Inc.
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Laura L. Beoglos
Represented By: Joseph A. Sebolt
Represented By: Richard B. Megley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Equipment Corporation
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Represented By: Laura L. Beoglos
Represented By: Joseph A. Sebolt
Represented By: Richard B. Megley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?