Tishel v. Dolgen Midwest, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Edward Tishel
Defendant: Courtney Piper and Dolgen Midwest, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01160
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #5 Defendants Motion for Extension of Time until July 31, 2019 to Answer. Dolgen Midwest, LLC answer due 7/31/2019; Courtney Piper answer due 7/31/2019. Approved by Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/21/2019.(W,CM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until July 31, 2019 to answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Courtney Piper. (Thrush, Corey)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Dolgen Midwest, LLC on 6/10/2019, filed on behalf of Edward Tishel Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Courtney Piper on 6/12/2019, filed on behalf of Edward Tishel Related document(s) #2 . (J,FE)
June 6, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Courtney Piper placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70173040000052294646. (W,Jo)
June 6, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Dolgen Midwest, LLC placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70173040000052294639. (W,Jo)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Dolgen Midwest, LLC, Courtney Piper. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
May 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (B,R)
May 21, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (B,R)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9318766.. Filed by Edward Tishel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Mapley, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tishel v. Dolgen Midwest, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tishel
Represented By: Peter C. Mapley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Piper
Represented By: Corey N. Thrush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolgen Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Corey N. Thrush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?