Fair v. Ohio Bell Telephone Company et al

Plaintiff: Falencia A Fair
Defendant: Brooke Cisneros, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Lashon Borom, Janice King, The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Victoria Green and Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01181
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: William H Baughman
Referring Judge: Christopher A Boyko
2 Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for appointment of counsel filed by Plaintiff Falencia A Fair. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(S,KM)
June 10, 2019 Copy of #12 Order on Motion to strike and 6/10/19 non-document Order on Motion to strike mailed to Falencia A Fair, P.O. Box 46466, Bedford, OH 44128 on 6/10/19. Related document(s) #12 . (D,Ky)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] denying plaintiffs Motion to strike defendant's brief in opposition. (Related Doc #11 ). Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/10/19.(D,Ky)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Plaintiff's #7 motion to strike is denied. Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to file a brief setting out arguments and legal authorities in opposition to of the removal and in opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss on or before July 10, 2019. Defendants may file a combined brief in support of the motion to remand and a reply in support of the motion to dismiss on or before July 24, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr., on 6/10/19.(D,Ky) (Corrected order added on 6/10/2019: #2 order) (D,Ky).
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Strike Defendant's Brief in Opposition re #9 to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Motion to Strike filed by Plaintiff Falencia A Fair. Related document(s) #6 , #7 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Charge of Discrimination)(S,KM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. for pretrial supervision. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/7/2019. (H,CM)
June 7, 2019 Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. Related document #8 . (B,R)
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 Opposition to #6 and #7 motion to remand and Motion to strike filed by All Defendants. (Wentz, Amy)
June 6, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, Judge Patricia A. Gaughan terminated. (B,R)
June 5, 2019 Copy of #8 mailed to Falencia A Fair at P.O. Box 46466, Bedford, OH 44128 on 6/5/19. (LC,S)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order: Although the Civil Cover Sheet indicates this case may be related to a terminated civil action, the Court has been informed by the pro se staff attorney that this case is a re-filing of Case No. 1:16 CV 186, Falencia Fair v. Victoria Green, et al. Thus, the Clerk's Office is directed to re-assign this case to the originally-assigned judge, i.e., Judge Christopher Boyko, pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 6/5/19. (LC,S)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to strike any motions/post-removal filed by Plaintiff Falencia A Fair. (S,KM)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Objection to Post Removal filed by Falencia A Fair. Related document(s) #1 . (S,KM) (Attachment(s): #1 Exhibit 1. Email, #2 Envelope)
May 28, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (Y,A)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to another judge. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/28/2019. (R,Sh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Lashon Borom, Brooke Cisneros, Victoria Green, Janice King, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - 532-2013-01517, #3 Exhibit B - 532-2013-02222, #4 Exhibit C - 532-2014-00139, #5 Exhibit D - 532-2014-00992, #6 Exhibit E - 532-2014-00718, #7 Exhibit F - 532-2014-00719, #8 Exhibit G - 532-2014-01815, #9 Exhibit H - 532-2014-01707, #10 Exhibit I - 532-2015-00958, #11 Exhibit J - 532-2015-01806, #12 Exhibit K - 532-2016-00933)(Wentz, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Notice by Clerk that Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (B,R)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate AT&T Teleholdings, Inc., Other Affiliate AT&T Inc. for The Ohio Bell Telephone Company filed by The Ohio Bell Telephone Company. (Wentz, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-914301 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9322319. Filer has indicated that case may be related to terminated civil action 1:16-cv-00186-CAB. Filed by Janice King, Lashon Borom, Victoria Green, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., The Ohio Bell Telephone Company, Brooke Cisneros. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summonses, #3 Exhibit C - Docket, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wentz, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fair v. Ohio Bell Telephone Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooke Cisneros
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lashon Borom
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janice King
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Green
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Bell Telephone Company
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falencia A Fair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?