Gardner, et al. v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Plaintiff: Chantel N Gardner, Skyla McIntyre and Jazmine Gardner
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01188
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James S Gwin
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order to Consolidate signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/28/19. The instant case is consolidated with Case No. 1:19CV00421 Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, et al v. Electrolux Home Products Inc. All future filings shall be made in lead Case No. 1:19CV00421. (Related Doc. #5 ) (D,MA)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 6/24/19. A consolidated case management conference with Case No. 1:19CV00421 is set for 6/26/19 at 10:30 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (D,MA)
June 17, 2019 Judge James S. Gwin assigned to case, Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr terminated. (Y,A)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion to reassign case to Judge James Gwin. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 6/17/2019.(W,CM)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to reassign case to Judge James Gwin Motion to consolidate filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint)(Smith, Chelsea). Modified text on 5/31/2019 (S,SR).
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Smith, Chelsea)
May 24, 2019 Notice to Attorney Matthew A. Craig. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (P,WL)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
May 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
May 23, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent AB Electrolux for Electrolux Home Products, Inc. filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.. (Smith, Chelsea)s/ by Courtenay Jalics. Modified text on 5/28/2019 (S,SR).
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Lorain County Ohio, Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-cv-197955 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9325773. Filed by Electrolux Home Products, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint) (Smith, Chelsea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardner, et al. v. Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc.
Represented By: Courtenay Youngblood Jalics
Represented By: Chelsea M.C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chantel N Gardner
Represented By: Arthur E. Dombek
Represented By: Matthew A. Craig
Represented By: Leonard Ehrenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyla McIntyre
Represented By: Arthur E. Dombek
Represented By: Matthew A. Craig
Represented By: Leonard Ehrenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmine Gardner
Represented By: Arthur E. Dombek
Represented By: Matthew A. Craig
Represented By: Leonard Ehrenreich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?