Crawford et al v. Groft et al
Plaintiff: Lashonda Crawford
Defendant: Justin Witten, Rock Ohio Caesars Cleveland, John Doe, Jack Cleveland Casino LLC and Delbert Groft
3Rd Party Defendant: American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc. and Theresa LoBue
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Jack Entertainment LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01223
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Justin Witten placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70153010000078627528. (W,Jo)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Justin Witten. (S,SR)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 Minutes of proceedings before Judge Donald C. Nugent. Case Management Conference held on 6/18/2019. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 10/1/2019. Next Status Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent. (Court Reporter: None.) Time: 30 minutes. (M,S)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 Praecipe for issuance of Summons & Amended Complaint filed by Lashonda Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint Amended Complaint)(Escovar, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Marginal Entry Order granting Plaintiff's Motion to excuse appearance of Lead Counsel at June 18, 2019 Case Management Conference (Related Doc #10 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/12/2019.(M,S)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 Marginal Entry Order granting Third-Party Defendants' Motion to excuse appearance of Lead Counsel at June 18, 2019 Case Management Conference (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Donald C. Nugent on 6/12/2019.(M,S)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Order filed by Lashonda Crawford. Related document(s) #10 . (Escovar, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to excuse appearance of Lead Counsel at Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Lashonda Crawford. Related document(s) #9 . (Escovar, Thomas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Patrick Ebner filed by on behalf of Lashonda Crawford. (Escovar, Thomas) s/ by Patrick Ebner Modified text on 6/12/2019 (S,SR).
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc., Theresa LoBue. (Saunders, Ryan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to excuse appearance of Lead Counsel at Case Management Conference filed by American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc., Theresa LoBue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mannion, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Ryan R. Saunders filed by on behalf of American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc., Theresa LoBue. (Saunders, Ryan)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Third-Party Complaint of Jack Cleveland Casino, LLC dba Jack Casino filed by American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc., Theresa LoBue. (Mannion, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 6/18/2019 at 11:30 AM at Chambers 15A before Judge Donald C. Nugent.. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 5/31/2019. (M,S)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc.. (Mannion, Thomas)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
May 29, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
May 29, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-19-911792 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9333386. Filed by American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All Filings from State Court, #2Exhibit B - Certificate of Compliance, #3 Civil Cover Sheet ) (Mannion, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford et al v. Groft et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Witten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Ohio Caesars Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Cleveland Casino LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Philipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delbert Groft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: American Red Cross of Cleveland Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Mannion
Represented By: Ryan R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Theresa LoBue
Represented By: Thomas P. Mannion
Represented By: Ryan R. Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Jack Entertainment LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Philipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashonda Crawford
Represented By: Thomas J. Escovar
Represented By: Patrick J. Ebner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?