United States of America v. $102,412.00 in U.S. Currency, et al.
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Three (3) Firearms and $102,412.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Darnell Emory
Case Number: 1:2019cv01231
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint by claimant filed by Darnell Emory. (Bradley, Steven)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Verified Claim Of Interest Of Darnell Emory In Defendant Property filed by Darnell Emory. (Bradley, Steven)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Marshal's Return executed as to warrant of arrest in rem filed by United States of America. Related document(s) #2 . (S,KM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 Marshal's Return of Warrant of Arrest in Rem executed on 6/6/2019 filed by United States of America. Remarks: asset was taken into custody on 4/12/2019. (S,KM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Darnell Emory on 6/3/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of United States of America Related document(s) #1 . (S,KM)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Directly Related Case filed by United States of America. (Morford, James)
May 30, 2019 Service by Clerk. Notice and Complaint addressed to Darnell Emory placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140150000158886637. (B,R)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Warrant of Arrest in Rem for $102,412.00 in U.S. currency, a Taurus 9mm pistol, serial number:TLM79086 with ammunition, Taurus .357 revolver, serial number:KT18367, and a Smith & Wesson 40 caliber pistol, serial no.: DUH0271 with ammunition, seized on February 13, 2019 issued to U.S. Marshal on 5/30/19. (Y,A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #1 Warrant or Arrest in REM) (Y,A). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #2 USM-285) (Y,A).
May 30, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
May 30, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Forfeiture against All Defendants.. Filing fee exempt. Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Praecipe FBI, #3 Warrant of Arrest in REM FBI, #4 Praecipe USMS, #5 Warrant of Arrest USMS, #6 Process and Return USMS, #7 Notice to Potential Claimant) (Morford, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $102,412.00 in U.S. Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Darnell Emory
Represented By: Steven L. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three (3) Firearms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $102,412.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: James L. Morford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?