Horvath v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Angie Horvath
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01262
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: James R Knepp
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42:425
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by certified mail executed upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration through U.S. Attorney on 6/10/2019; Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration on 6/10/2019; U.S. Attorney General on 6/10/2019 filed on behalf of Angie Horvath. Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (M,L)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form)(S,JM)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 6/5/2019. (S,JM)
June 3, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 6/3/19. (Y,A)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
June 3, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (Y,A)
June 3, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 2, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Angie Horvath. (Wilson, Rachel)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration.. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Angie Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to Atty General, #4 Summons to Asst. U.S. Atty, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to Atty General, #7 USM-285 to Asst. U.S. Atty) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horvath v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angie Horvath
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?