Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Call et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: City of North Ridgeville Ohio, Edith M. Call, Mr. John Doe, Mills Creek Association, Fifth Third Bank (Northeastern Ohio), Lorain County Treasurer and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01274
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of receipt received from Lorain County Court of Common Pleas on 6/24/2019 of certified copies of docket sheet and order of remand. Related document(s) #6 . (P,G)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Certified copy of order of remand and docket sheet mailed to Lorain County Court of Common Pleas with acknowledgment of receipt enclosed. Related document(s) #5 . (P,G)
June 17, 2019 Copy of #5 Order of Remand mailed to Amanda B. Romanello and Olivia M. Earls, Lerner, Sampson & Rothfuss - Cincinnati, 8th Floor, 120 East Fourth Street, P.O. Box 5480, Cincinnati, OH 45201-5480 and Edith M. Call, 5278 Mills Creek Lane, North Ridgeville, OH 44039 on 06/17/2019. (M,TL)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Remand. Removal of this action is not proper. Where diversity of citizenship is the basis for removal, as it is here, the case cannot be removed from state court if any of the Defendants are citizens of the state in which the action is brought. Call states that she is a citizen of Ohio and so cannot remove it based on diversity of citizenship. Furthermore, Call filed this Notice of Removal well beyond thirty days from the date of service. Finally, it is apparent that Call filed this Notice of Removal for the improper purpose of interfering with the state court proceedings. This is not an acceptable use of the Court's time and resources. This Court is authorized to impose sanctions on litigants who file frivolous or harassing actions. Call is notified that future attempts to use this Court's resources for the sole purpose of impeding state court proceedings may result in the imposition of sanctions against her. Accordingly, this action is remanded to the Lorain County Court of Common Pleas. See Order for complete details. Judge John R. Adams on 06/17/2019. (M,TL)
June 5, 2019 Notice to Attorney Amanda B. Romanello. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (O,K)
June 5, 2019 Notice to Attorney Olivia M. Earls. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. Related document(s) #1 . (O,K)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Short Form Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Defendant Edith M. Call. (Y,A)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
June 4, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
June 4, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Court of Common Pleas Lorain County, case number 18 CV 194548 Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Edith M. Call. (Attachments: #1 Complaint in Foreclosure, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Y,A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Call et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of North Ridgeville Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edith M. Call
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mills Creek Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank (Northeastern Ohio)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorain County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Olivia M. Earls
Represented By: Amanda B. Romanello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?