Noco Company v. Marrero
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Jake Marrero
Case Number: 1:2019cv01291
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Copy of #6 Default Entered mailed to Defendant Jake Marrero, dba Marr-Jak, 3916 Bergenline Avenue, Union City, NJ 07087 on 7/26/2019. Related document(s) #6 . (JLG)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 Default Entered on 7/26/2019 against Defendant Jake Marrero. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Judy L. Guyer, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #5 . (JLG)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Jake Marrero d/b/a Marr-Jak filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit for Entry of Default)(Malone, Sean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by via Federal Express executed upon Jake Marrero on 6/11/2019, filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #3 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Proof of Delivery)(Pinney, Jon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jake Marrero. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 5, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (B,R)
June 5, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (B,R)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Jake Marrero. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9346426.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?