Noco Company v. Toner
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Lisa Toner
Case Number: 1:2019cv01328
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Default Entered on 7/22/2019 against Lisa Toner. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Katherine King, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #5 . (K,K)
July 22, 2019 Copy of #6 Default Entered mailed to Lisa Toner at Unit 36F, 6601 Lyons Road, Coconut Creek, FL 33073 on 7/22/2019. (K,K)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Lisa Toner d/b/a Mixed Bag Media filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit for Entry of Default)(Malone, Sean)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service by via Federal Express executed upon Lisa Toner on 6/17/2019, filed on behalf of Noco Company Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Proof of Delivery)(Pinney, Jon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Lisa Toner. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
June 10, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Lisa Toner. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9354677. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's sales on Amazon, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Toner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Toner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?