International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Canadian National Railway Company
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Defendant: Canadian National Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01373
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to continue case management conference (Related Doc #9 ). Case management conference rescheduled to 8/22/2019 at 02:15 PM in Chambers 16A.. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/5/2019.(L,Ja)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Counter-Defendant International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division, Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. Related document(s) #7 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Answer filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. Related document(s) #3 . (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/14/2019 at 02:15 PM at Chambers 16A before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (L,Ja)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Respondent's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Robert S. Hawkins for Canadian National Railway Company,Robert S. Hawkins for Canadian National Railway Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #5 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/19/2019.(L,Ja)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for attorney Robert S. Hawkins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14660115878. Filed by Canadian National Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit of Robert S. Hawkins, #2 Exhibit B- Certificate of Good Standing)(Y,A)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Respondent's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Andrew J. Rolfes for Canadian National Railway Company. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #4 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/12/2019.(L,Ja)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for attorney Andrew J. Rolfes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 14660115734, filed by Defendant Canadian National Railway Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(S,KM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Petition and Counter-Petition to Vacate Award filed by Canadian National Railway Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Alexandersen, Kevin)
July 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. (Y,A)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 13, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
June 13, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Petition to enforce public law board award under the railway labor act against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9363463. Filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A-PLB Award) (Diehl-Gibbons, Erika) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (S,SR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division v. Canadian National Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canadian National Railway Company
Represented By: Andrew J. Rolfes
Represented By: Robert S. Hawkins
Represented By: Kevin C. Alexandersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail & Transportation Workers, Transportation Division
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Represented By: Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?