Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC v. ADM Labs ,et al.
Plaintiff: Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Colin Davis, Jake Shortino, Arman Motiwalla, John Does (1-10), ADM Group, ADM Labs, ADM Labs LLC and ADM Group LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01382
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 Reply in support of #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. Rs. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) filed by ADM Group LLC, ADM Labs LLC, Colin Davis, Arman Motiwalla, Jake Shortino. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of J. Shortino, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Completion, #3 Exhibit B IP Address)(Hochman, Jason)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order For the convenience of the Court, and by no later than 14 days from the date of this Order for transferred cases, the parties are directed to refile herein any motions and related briefing that were previously filed in state court and which remained pending at the time of removal. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 08/08/2019. (W,RA)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 Opposition to #6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. Rs. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Analysis, #2 Exhibit 2 - Invoice from ADM, #3 Exhibit 3 - Hemp Sales Order Form, #4 Exhibit 4 - Lab Results, #5 Exhibit 5 - Affidavit of William Jeffrey Adams, #6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Tracey Adams, #7 Exhibit 7 - Certified FedEx tracking report)(Lindner, Daniel)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Plaintiff's Motion to exceed page limitations up to five (5) additional pages (Related Doc #9 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 07/26/2019.(L,Ja)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for leave to exceed page limitations filed by Plaintiff Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC. Related document(s) #6 ,. (Lindner, Daniel)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Granting #8 Joint Proposed Stipulation for 7 day extension of time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 7/29/2019. Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/22/2019. (L,Ja)
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 Joint Proposed Stipulation for 7 day extension of time to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC. (Lindner, Daniel)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/10/19. For purposes of clarification, the parties are advised that the Court's Order dated 7/3/19 was intended to terminate any upcoming telephonic and/or in-person conferences and hearings set by the previously assigned district judge. All other case management deadlines (including pleading amendment, discovery, expert, briefing, and dispositive motions deadlines) remain in effect. In addition, any referrals to the assigned Magistrate Judge (including for mediation and/or settlement conferences) remain in effect. Any status, final pre-trial and trial dates set to take place before the previously assigned district judge will be reset at a later date. (S,G)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/3/19. All deadlines and hearings set by the previous District Judge are terminated and will be reset forthwith. (D,MA)
July 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela A. Barker pursuant to General Order 2019-13. (Y,A)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 State Court documents received from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (L,Ja)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim , Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed. Rs. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) filed by ADM Group LLC, ADM Labs LLC, Colin Davis, Arman Motiwalla, Jake Shortino. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of A. Motiwalla, #3 Exhibit Declaration of J. Shortino, #4 Exhibit Declaration of C. Davis)(Hochman, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC. (Lindner, Daniel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADM Group LLC. (Hochman, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by ADM Labs LLC. (Hochman, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV19915419 Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9365881. Filed by Arman Motiwalla, ADM Group, Jake Shortino, ADM Labs, Colin Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Summons, #2 Exhibit B, Complaint, #3 Exhibit C, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hochman, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC v. ADM Labs ,et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colin Davis
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jake Shortino
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arman Motiwalla
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-10)
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Group
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Labs
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Labs LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADM Group LLC
Represented By: Jason D. Hochman
Represented By: Thomas A. Barni
Represented By: Benjamin D. Carnahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodigy OG Vegas Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Daniel F. Lindner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?