Noco Company v. Keifitz
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Mikhael Keifitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv01413
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Copy of #6 Default Entered mailed to Mikhael Keifitz, d/b/a VIPOUTLET, at 1835 East Hallandale Beach Blvd., Hallandale, FL 33180 on 7/30/2019. (K,K)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Default Entered on 7/30/2019 against Mikhael Keifitz d/b/a VIPOUTLET. Sandy Opacich, Clerk by Katherine King, Deputy Clerk. Related document(s) #5 . (K,K)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Mikhael Keifitz dba VIPOutlet filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit for Entry of Default)(Malone, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Return of Service via Federal Express executed upon Mikhael Keifitz on 6/24/2019, filed on behalf of Noco Company. Related documents #3 , #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Federal Express Proof of Delivery) (Pinney, Jon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Mikhael Keifitz. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
June 19, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
June 19, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Mikhael Keifitz. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9373040.. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Sales, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Keifitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikhael Keifitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?