Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company v. Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01432
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Solomon Oliver
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.. (Agati, Andrew)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Counterclaim against Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company filed by Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Stop Gap Endorsement)(Agati, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until July 30, 2019 to answer Complaint. Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc. answer due 7/30/2019.. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 7/23/2019.(R,Sh)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated Motion for extension of time until July 30, 2019 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.. (Agati, Andrew)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Attorney Appearance by Andrew Agati, Douglas J. Suter and Anna L. Seiger filed by on behalf of Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc. (Agati, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Ironshore Holdings (US) Inc., Corporate Parent Ironshore, Inc. for Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Ryan, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment with jury demand. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9376144. Filed by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (Ryan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company v. Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelley Steel Erectors, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Agati
Represented By: Anna L. Seiger
Represented By: Douglas J. Suter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher M. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?