Collins v. Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jamise Collins
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01433
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM at Chambers 16A before Judge Pamela A. Barker. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 07/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting)(L,Ja)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (L,Ja)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.. (Williams, Kara)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.. (Williams, Kara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc. on 7/1/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Jamise Collins Related document(s) #2 . (S,KM)
June 27, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified mail. Receipt # 70190160000057922759. (J,FE)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 21, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
June 21, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9376553. Filed by Jamise Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A- Consent of Jamise Collins) (Lalak, Christopher) (Y,A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collins v. Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamise Collins
Represented By: Christopher J. Lalak
Represented By: Shannon M. Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodwill Industries of Greater Cleveland & East Central Ohio, Inc.
Represented By: Kara D. Williams
Represented By: Steven E. Seasly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?