O'Brien Construction, Inc. v. Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric

Plaintiff: O'Brien Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric
Case Number: 1:2019cv01451
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 Brief In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. Related document(s) #14 . (Crossett, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Crossett, David)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to change/transfer venue filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crossett, David)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for relief for 10 additional pages for the length of Defendant's forthcoming brief in support of a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint (Related Doc #12 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/19/2019.(L,Ja)
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for relief From Local Rule 7.1(f) filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Crossett, David)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Denying as moot, Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (Related Doc #8 )and denying without prejudice Motion to change/transfer venue (Related Doc #9 ). Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/15/2019.(L,Ja)
August 14, 2019 Filing 10 Amended complaint against Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. Filed by O'Brien Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - February 2019 Email, #2 Exhibit 2 - Original Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 - Subcontract, #4 Exhibit 4 - April 2019 Email, #5 Exhibit 5 - Infringing Agreement) (O'Connell, T.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document]granting Defendant's Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney David W. Crossett for Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. (Related Doc #7 ). Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/1/2019.(L,Ja)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to transfer venue to United States District Court Middle District of Pennsylvania filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Michael Miller on Forum Non Conveniens)(Skeriotis, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim under FRCP 12(b)(6), lack of subject-matter jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(1) and lack of personal jurisdiction under FRCP 12(b)(2) filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A: Affidavit of Michael Miller on Personal Jurisdiction, #3 Exhibit B: Tables 1.1 through 1.4 Referenced in Brief in Support)(Skeriotis, John)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for attorney David W. Crossett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-9446137, filed by Defendant Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of David W. Crossett)(Skeriotis, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by O'Brien Construction, Inc.. Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric waiver sent on 7/19/2019, answer due 9/17/2019 filed on behalf of O'Brien Construction, Inc. (O'Connell, T.)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 7/10/19. For purposes of clarification, the parties are advised that the Court's Order dated 7/2/19 was intended to terminate any upcoming telephonic and/or in-person conferences and hearings set by the previously assigned district judge. All other case management deadlines (including pleading amendment, discovery, expert, briefing, and dispositive motions deadlines) remain in effect. In addition, any referrals to the assigned Magistrate Judge (including for mediation and/or settlement conferences) remain in effect. Any status, final pre-trial and trial dates set to take place before the previously assigned district judge will be reset at a later date. (D,MA)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. (L,Ja)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] All deadlines and hearings set by the previous District Judge are terminated and will be reset forthwith. Any deadlines or hearing dates imposed by the referral Magistrate Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 07/02/2019. (W,RA)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by O'Brien Construction, Inc.. (O'Connell, T.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Form issued. Summons were not provided and were not issued. (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, (B,R)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by O'Brien Construction, Inc.. (O'Connell, T.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9380652. Filed by O'Brien Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringing Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (O'Connell, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien Construction, Inc. v. Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller dba Pro-Electric
Represented By: John M. Skeriotis
Represented By: David W. Crossett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Brien Construction, Inc.
Represented By: T. Christopher O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?