Terves LLC v. Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.
Plaintiff: Terves LLC
Defendant: Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01462
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Defendant's #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. answer due 9/13/2019. Approved by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/14/2019.(S,SR)
August 13, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 13, 2019 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.. Related document(s) #15 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Cipolla, John)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting #15 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. answer due 8/14/2019. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/16/19.(P,R)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until August 14, 2019 to answer complaint filed by Defendant Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Cipolla, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Attorney Appearance by John S. Cipolla filed by on behalf of Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.. (Cipolla, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Attorney Appearance Notice of Appearance as Counsel for Defendant by Peter Turner filed by on behalf of Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.. (Turner, Peter)
July 2, 2019 Minutes of proceedings [non-document] On July 2, 2019, the Court held a scheduled teleconference attended by Plaintiff's President & CEO Andy Sherman, Plaintiff's counsel Matthew J. Cavanagh, Defendant's President Brian Thomas, and Defendant's counsel Peter Turner and John Cippolla. The Court discussed with the parties Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and determined that no real urgency exists to require expedited discovery. Accordingly, the Court DENIED Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery, Doc #: #6 . The Court encouraged the parties to get together and negotiate a resolution. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 15 minutes. (K,K)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service by personal service executed upon Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. on 6/26/2019, filed on behalf of Terves LLC (Cupar, David)
June 27, 2019 Notice [non-document] of Telephone Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. (K,K)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Notice to take Deposition of Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. on July 23, 2019 filed by Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Expedited Rule 34 Requests filed by Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Expedited Interrogatories filed by Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 Supplement to Motion Expedited Discovery - Memorandum in Support of Terves' Motion for Expedited Discovery, filed by Terves LLC. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion for Expedited Discovery)(Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by Plaintiff Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to Complaint, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Terves LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Terves LLC. (Cupar, David)
June 25, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR....Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Terves LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Cupar, David) Modified on 6/25/2019 (W,Jo).
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Thompson Aluminum Casting Co. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9382863. Filed by Terves LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, U.S. Patent No. 9,903,010, #2 Exhibit B, U.S. Patent No. 10,329,653) (Cupar, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terves LLC v. Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Aluminum Casting Co.
Represented By: John S. Cipolla
Represented By: Peter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terves LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Cavanagh
Represented By: David B. Cupar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?