Nakhle v. United States of America, et al.
Plaintiff: Madison 89 Deli and Claude Nakhle
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01470
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07:2023
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Summons and Complaint Request for Service by the Clerk filed by Claude Nakhle. Related document(s) #2 , #1 , #3 .(Schlachet, Jaye)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] Case Management Conference of 8/28/19 has been continued to10/02/19 at 9:00 a.m. as Plaintiff has failed to perfect service. If service has not been perfected by the time allowed by law, case will be dismissed. Case Management Conference will be conducted by telephone with the Court initiating the call. Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 8/22/19. (D,Ma)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/28/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 26, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (Y,A)
June 26, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Madison 89 Deli. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to US Attorney General, #2 Summons as to US Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service) (Schlachet, Jaye)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Judicial Review of Determination of U.S. Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service against Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9384243. Filed by Claude Nakhle. (Attachments: #1Exhibit 1 Letter of 3/6/19, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter of 3/20/19, #3 Exhibit 3 USDA Decision, #4 Exhibit 4 Proof of Delivery, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons US Attorney General, #7 Summons Food and Nutrition Service, #8 Praecipe for Issuance) (Schlachet, Jaye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nakhle v. United States of America, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison 89 Deli
Represented By: Jaye M. Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude Nakhle
Represented By: Jaye M. Schlachet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?