Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Varone, et al.
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Vincent Varone, April C. Rich, Ginger Varone and Jason S. Varone
Case Number: 1:2019cv01492
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Patricia A Gaughan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by April C. Rich, Ginger Varone, Jason S. Varone. (Harvey, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by April C. Rich, Ginger Varone, Jason S. Varone. (Harvey, Michael)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of Service Returned Executed by April C. Rich, Jason S. Varone, Ginger Varone. April C. Rich waiver sent on 7/13/2019, answer due 9/11/2019; Jason S. Varone waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019; Ginger Varone waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019 filed on behalf of April C. Rich; Jason S. Varone; Ginger Varone (Harvey, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint,, filed by April C. Rich, Ginger Varone, Jason S. Varone. (Harvey, Michael)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Harvey filed by on behalf of April C. Rich, Ginger Varone, Jason S. Varone. (Harvey, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Service of Complaint in Interpleader, Summons and Consent to Exercise Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge upon All Defendants filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service upon April C. Rich, #2 Affidavit of Service upon Ginger Varone, #3 Affidavit of Service upon Jason Varone, #4 Affidavit of Service upon Vincent Varone, #5 Affidavit of Service upon Vincent Varone c-o Northcoast Behavioral Healthcare)Related document(s) #3 , #1 .(Bulea, Donald)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference set on 8/29/2019 at 9:00 am to be held telephonically by Hon. Patricia A. Gaughan. Signed by Judge Patricia A. Gaughan on 7/02/19. (D,Ma)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon April C. Rich, Ginger Varone, Jason S. Varone, Vincent Varone. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Magistrate Consent Form) (Y,A)
June 28, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (Y,A)
June 28, 2019 Judge Patricia A. Gaughan assigned to case, (Y,A)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Bulea, Donald)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint in Interpleader against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9389885. Filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Prudential Group Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Death Certificate, #3 Exhibit C - News Article, #4 Exhibit D - Beneficiary Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Record of Payments to Beneficiaries, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons April Rich, #8 Summons Ginger Varone, #9 Summons Jason Varone, #10 Summons Vincent Varone, #11 Summons Vincent Varone c-o Northcoast Behavioral) (Bulea, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Varone, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Varone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April C. Rich
Represented By: Michael P. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ginger Varone
Represented By: Michael P. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason S. Varone
Represented By: Michael P. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Donald C. Bulea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Donald C. Bulea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?