Mace v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jean Mace
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01502
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Boyko
Referring Judge: George J Limbert
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal executed upon Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney via personal service on 7/12/2019; c/o US Attorney via FedEx on 7/15/19; c/o Regional Chief Counsel via FedEx on 7/16/19 filed on behalf of Kimberly Jean Mace. Related document(s) #8 . (M,TL)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Original Summonses, Complaints, and Magistrate Consent Forms issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,AA)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order: Defendant is to file a certified copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings and answer within 60 days from the date of service of the complaint; within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and answer, plaintiff must file a brief; within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's brief, defendant may file a brief in support of the Commissioner's decision; if plaintiff chooses to respond to defendant's brief, plaintiff shall file a reply brief within 14 days from the filing of defendant's brief; further, plaintiff's counsel shall immediately fax or email the U.S. Attorney's Office, Northern District of Ohio, the case name, case number, and plaintiff's social security number, and shall file a certificate, confirming that such notice has been sent. Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 7/10/2019. (S,AA)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,AA)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order: granting plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 7/10/2019.(S,AA)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Certification that Social Security Number Sent to Defendant filed by Kimberly Jean Mace. Related document(s) #1 .(Shifrin, Debra)
July 1, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert on 7/1/19. (Y,A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
July 1, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 1, 2019 Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Jean Mace. Related document(s) #1 . (Shifrin, Debra)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Kimberly Jean Mace. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 USM-285) (Shifrin, Debra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mace v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jean Mace
Represented By: Debra S. Shifrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?