Noco Company v. Ball
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Defendant: Christopher Ball
Case Number: 1:2019cv01505
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of Dismissal with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and court costs. (Realted document #6 ). Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/23/2019. (K,K)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Noco Company. (Malone, Sean)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Christopher Ball on 7/15/2019, no delivery date on green card, date obtained from U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Noco Company (Related document(s) #4 ) (J,FE)
July 10, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Christopher Ball placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70183090000032259966. (Y,A)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Christopher Ball. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
July 2, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (B,R)
July 2, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (B,R)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 Complaint with Jury Demand, filed by Noco Company. Filing Fee Paid $400.00. Receipt Number 0647-9394260 Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Desist Letter, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pinney, Jon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Noco Company. (Pinney, Jon)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR. Document incomplete. Attorney refilled as document #3 .Complaint with jury demand against Christopher Ball. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9394260. Filed by Noco Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reseller Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Sales on Ebay.com, #3 Exhibit C - Cease and Decease Letter, #4 Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons) (Pinney, Jon) Modified on 7/1/2019 (B,R).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noco Company v. Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noco Company
Represented By: Jon J. Pinney
Represented By: Sean P. Malone
Represented By: David R. Posteraro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?