Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp and Beechwood Music Corporation
Defendant: Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc. and Joseph A. Niemi
Case Number: 1:2019cv01563
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: John R Adams
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim (to dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims) filed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Beechwood Music Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. Related document(s) #6 . (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Chudakoff, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs filed by Joseph A. Niemi, Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc.. (H,SP)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Joseph A. Niemi at Painsville, Ohio address (date unknown, USPS website indicates information not available); Joseph Niemi at Jefferson, Ohio address on 7/17/2019; Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon Inc., c/o Joseph A. Niemi, CEO (date unknown, USPS website indicates information not available); Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon Inc., c/o Joe A. Niemi Statutory Agent on 7/17/2019, filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Related document #4 . (J,FE) Modified text on 8/21/2019 (S,He).
July 12, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc., receipt # 70051160000458695201 and the Statutory Agent, receipt # 70051160000458695188, Joseph A. Niemi, receipt # 0051160000458695218 and 70051160000458695195 placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. (Y,A)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc., Joseph A. Niemi at Jefferson, Ohio and Painsville, Ohio addresses and Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc. c/o Joe A. Niemi, Statutory Agent. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (K,AR)
July 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,L)
July 10, 2019 Judge John R. Adams assigned to case. (M,L)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Beechwood Music Corporation Corporate Parent is Capitol EMI Music Inc., Broadcast Music Inc. Affiliate is TEGNA Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. Corporate Parent is Vivendi SA and Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp Corporate Parent is Warner Music Group Corp. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (AO121) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Chudakoff, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc., Joseph A. Niemi. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9406116.. Filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Beechwood Music Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Song Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons to Defendant Jamms c/o CEO, #4 Summons to Defendant Jamms c/o statutory agent, #5 Summons to Defendant Niemi in Painesville, OH, #6 Summons to Defendant Niemi in Jefferson, OH) (Chudakoff, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beechwood Music Corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Chudakoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamms Midnight Moon Saloon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Niemi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?