Petherbridge v. Epiroc et al
Plaintiff: Greg Petherbridge
Defendant: Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC, Epiroc USA LLC, Epiroc North America Corp., John Doe Entities, Epiroc and John Doe Corporations
Case Number: 1:2019cv01569
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC, Epiroc, Epiroc North America Corp., Epiroc USA LLC. (Toth, K.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order: Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on September 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of the Honorable Sara Lioi at (330) 252-6060. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by September 6, 2019. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by September 13, 2019. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting)(D,N)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC, Epiroc, Epiroc North America Corp., Epiroc USA LLC. (Toth, K.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Witness List, #2 Appendix B - Exhibit List)(T,Je)
July 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (M,L)
July 10, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,L)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Epiroc Rock Drills AB, Corporate Parent Epiroc AB, Other Affiliate Epiroc North America Corp., Other Affiliate Epiroc USA LLC for Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC filed by Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC. (Toth, K.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Epiroc Rock Drills AB, Corporate Parent Epiroc AB, Other Affiliate Epiroc North America Corp. for Epiroc USA LLC filed by Epiroc USA LLC. (Toth, K.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Epiroc Rock Drills AB, Corporate Parent Epiroc AB for Epiroc North America Corp. filed by Epiroc North America Corp.. (Toth, K.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Epiroc. (Toth, K.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 19 916527 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9407025.. Filed by Epiroc USA LLC, Epiroc North America Corp., Epiroc, Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Toth, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petherbridge v. Epiroc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Copco Mining and Construction USA LLC
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epiroc USA LLC
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epiroc North America Corp.
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epiroc
Represented By: K. Ellen Toth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Petherbridge
Represented By: Louis J. Licata
Represented By: Victor A. Mezacapa, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?