Bower, et al. v. GGB Mgmt. Co., et al.
Plaintiff: Robert K. Bower and Charlene Apel
Defendant: GGB Mgmt, Co. and J.P. Farley Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01574
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 9/23/2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Judge Benita Y. Pearson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall set up the conference call and contact Chambers directly at 330-884-7435, with all participants on the line. The Court requires personal participation of parties at the Case Management Conference, even when the conference is telephonic. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Attachment No. 1, #2 Attachment No. 2, #3 Attachment No. 3, #4 Attachment No. 4, #5 Attachment No. 5) (S,Ke)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by J.P. Farley Corporation. (Lee, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by J.P. Farley Corporation. (Asher, Kyle)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A)
July 10, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 10, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Trumbull County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019 CV 958 Filing fee paid $400, receipt number 0647-9408191. Filed by J.P. Farley Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket) (Asher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower, et al. v. GGB Mgmt. Co., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGB Mgmt, Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Farley Corporation
Represented By: Kyle M. Asher
Represented By: Thomas J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert K. Bower
Represented By: Stephen A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Apel
Represented By: Stephen A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?