Hill v. Medicare Transport, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Sparkle Hill
Defendant: Medicare Transport, Inc and Tanya Cargill
Case Number: 1:2019cv01582
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting as requested Defendants' #12 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/24/2019 to Answer or Otherwise Move to Plaintiff's Complaint. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 9/3/2019. (JLG)
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for extension of time until September 24, 2019 to answer or Otherwise Move to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Tanya Cargill, Medicare Transport, Inc. Related document(s) #1 . (Yelsky, Mitchell)
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Attorney Appearance by Mitchell J. Yelsky filed by on behalf of Tanya Cargill, Medicare Transport, Inc. (Yelsky, Mitchell)
August 29, 2019 Filing 10 Alias Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Medicare Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,Ke)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Praecipe for issuance of Alias Summons filed by Sparkle Hill. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Summons Alias Summons - Medicare Transport, Inc.)(Neel, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal unexecuted upon Medicare Transport, Inc. c/o Waiel M. Hamdan. Service attempted by Fed Ex on 8/16/2019 filed on behalf of Sparkle Hill. Related document(s) #4 . (Attachments: #1 Fed Ex Envelope)(E,CK)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Tanya Cargill on 8/16/2019, filed on behalf of Sparkle Hill Related document(s) #4 . (E,CK)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Tanya Cargill on 8/12/2019, filed on behalf of Sparkle Hill Related document(s) #4 . (W,Jo)
August 9, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Tanya Cargill placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70182290000129722282. (B,R)
August 9, 2019 Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Medicare Transport, Inc placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70182290000129722299. (B,R)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,Ke)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Tanya Cargill, Medicare Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 for Medicare Transport, Inc., #2 USM-285 for Tanya Cargill) (S,Ke)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/29/2019. (JLG)
July 11, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge George J. Limbert. (Y,A)
July 11, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Sparkle Hill. (Neel, David)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Sparkle Hill. (Attachments: #1 Summons upon Medicare Transport, Inc., #2 Summons upon Tanya Cargill, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Neel, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Medicare Transport, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicare Transport, Inc
Represented By: Mitchell J. Yelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Cargill
Represented By: Mitchell J. Yelsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sparkle Hill
Represented By: David W. Neel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?