Terves LLC v. Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Terves LLC
Defendant: Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd., Nick Yuan and Ecometal Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01611
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Donald C Nugent
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Marginal Entry Order granting Defendants' #5 Motion for Extension of Time until October 4, 2019 to Move or Otherwise Respond. Judge Donald C. Nugent on 9/5/2019.(M,S)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 4, 2019 to Move or Otherwise Respond filed by Ecometal Inc., Nick Yuan. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Forbes, Steven)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ecometal Inc., Nick Yuan, Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Consent Form) (B,R)
July 16, 2019 This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to #Local Patent Rules. (B,R)
July 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (B,R)
July 16, 2019 Judge Donald C. Nugent assigned to case, (B,R)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Terves LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Terves LLC. (Cavanagh, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against Ecometal Inc., Nick Yuan, Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-9416535.. Filed by Terves LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (the '010 patent), #2 Exhibit B (the '653 patent), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Nick Yuan, #5 Summons to Ecometal Inc., #6 Summons to Yueyang) (Cavanagh, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terves LLC v. Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yueyang Aerospace New Materials Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Yuan
Represented By: Steven J. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ecometal Inc.
Represented By: Steven J. Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terves LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Cavanagh
Represented By: David B. Cupar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?