Columbia MHC East LLC, et al. v. Stewart, et al.
Plaintiff: Columbia Park Water & Sewer System, Columbia MHC East LLC and Kenneth Burnham
Defendant: Melody J. Stewart, Public Utilities Commission of Ohio, Patricia Ann Blackmon, Tim McCormack, M. Shapiro Real Estate Group, LLC and U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01613
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of #6 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 19-3748). Date filed in USCA 8/7/19. (H,SP)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals from the #4 Opinion and Order and #5 Judgment Entry of 7/17/19, filed by Kenneth Burnham, Columbia MHC East LLC. (Filing fee $505, receipt number 0647-9456215) (Lucas, Harold)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Judgment Entry terminating case. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/17/19. (P,R)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Opinion and Order dismissing case with prejudice. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/17/19. (P,R)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Complaint - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by All Plaintiffs. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Summons US Bank, #2 Summons Stewart, #3 Summons Shapiro, #4 Summons PUCO, #5 Summons McCormack, #6 Summons Blackmon)(Lucas, Harold)
July 16, 2019 Remark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of a the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a). Without the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, the Clerk does not know if this case is related to or is a refiling of a pending/terminated case in this Court. An email was sent to the filing attorney regarding this matter. Related document(s) #1 . (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided, therefore were not issued. (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $400. Receipt number 0647-9417191. Filed by Kenneth Burnham, Columbia Park Water & Sewer System, Columbia MHC East LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Receiver's Request for Best and Final Offers, #3 Exhibit Columbia West's Response to Receiver's Request, #4 Exhibit Receiver's Reply to Columbia West's Response) (Lucas, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia MHC East LLC, et al. v. Stewart, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Utilities Commission of Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Ann Blackmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Shapiro Real Estate Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Park Water & Sewer System
Represented By: Harold E. Lucas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia MHC East LLC
Represented By: Harold E. Lucas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Burnham
Represented By: Harold E. Lucas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?