Hannah v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Cleaster Hannah
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01614
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kathleen B Burke
Referring Judge: Benita Y Pearson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by personal service executed upon the U.S. Attorney on 7/22/2019; by FedEx upon Commissioner of Social Security on 7/23/2019 and upon U.S. Attorney General on 7/23/2019 filed on behalf of Cleaster Hannah. Related document(s) #7 . (O,K)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Original Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Judge's Initial Order issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon the Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General and Office of Regional Chief Counsel. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,HR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Package issued. (S,HR)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant's Answer, the transcript of the administrative record and the parties' briefs shall be filed in accordance with Local Rule 16.3.1, including but not limited to the schedule set forth in that Rule. Any requests for an extension of time shall be filed at least five days prior to the due date for filing. Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Local Civil Rule 16.3.1)(S,HR)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting plaintiff's Motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Related Doc #2 ). Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke on 7/19/19.(S,HR)
July 16, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 7/16/19. (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Judge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Cleaster Hannah. Related document(s) #1 . (Margolius, Marcia)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Cleaster Hannah. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons Regional Chief Counsel SSA, #3 Summons US Attorney, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM-285 US Attorney, #6 USM-285 Attorney General, #7 USM-285 Regional Chief Counsel SSA) (Margolius, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannah v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ruchi Vikram Asher
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleaster Hannah
Represented By: Marcia W. Margolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?