R&R Produce, Inc. v. PK Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: R&R Produce, Inc.
Defendant: PK Produce, Inc., Paul G.A. Kasapis, Debbie Kasapis, George Argie and Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio
Case Number: 1:2019cv01673
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Office: Cleveland Office
Presiding Judge: Pamela A Barker
Referring Judge: Dan Aaron Polster
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order In accordance with Rule 42(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court exercises its discretion to consolidate the above captioned case with Case No. 1:19-cv-01673 in the interest of convenience of the parties and economy in judicial administration. All future filings shall be made in Case No. 1:18-cv-02754. The parties may move to separate the cases at a later date if grounds develop to separate the cases. All future filings are to be filed in 1:18-cv-02754. Signed by Judge Pamela A. Barker on 8/2/2019. (L,Ja)
August 1, 2019 Judge Pamela A. Barker assigned to case, Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (B,R)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] terminating case referral to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz pursuant to the reassignment of this matter to the docket of Judge Pamela A. Barker. (Related document #26 ). Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/1/2019. (K,K)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Pamela A. Barker for all further proceedings. Related document #24 . Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 8/1/2019. (K,K)
July 31, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 Joint Motion to consolidate cases filed by Plaintiff R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's #23 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by Effie F. Anastassiou. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again.. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/29/2019.(G,CA)
July 25, 2019 Filing 23 Motion for attorney Effie F. Anastassiou to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $120, receipt number 14660116065, filed by plaintiff R&R Produce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Y,A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2019: #3 Corrected Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (B,R).
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order referring case to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz for general pretrial supervision. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 7/24/2019. (K,K)
July 23, 2019 Filing 21 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (K,AR)
July 23, 2019 Notice by Clerk: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.13(b), R&R Produce, Inc. are reminded of their requirement to file a corporate disclosure statement. (K,AR)
July 23, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (K,AR)
July 23, 2019 Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case. (K,AR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 20 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Northern. Case number 5:19-cv-02966. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. Parties indicated case related to 1:18-cv-02754-PAB
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) #18 . Case TRANSFERRED to the U.S. District Court, Northern District of Ohio. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/22/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #17 MOTION to Change Venue MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by R&R Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order ON STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/19/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Change Venue MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) filed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Responses due by 7/31/2019. Replies due by 8/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF EFFIE F. ANASTASSIOU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #2 Proposed Order ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #3 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #4 Exhibit TO REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE ON MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(a))(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/15/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Paul G.A. Kasapis served on 7/12/2019, answer due 8/2/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 7/15/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&R Produce, Inc. for CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. Debbie Kasapis served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. George Argie served on 6/6/2019, answer due 6/27/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by R&R Produce, Inc.. PK Produce, Inc. served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101] *Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Certificate of Service filed by R &R Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R&R Produce, Inc. of Summons and Complaint (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/17/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by R&R Produce, Inc... (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/31/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to George Argie, Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio, Debbie Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, PK Produce, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/13/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by R&R Produce, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate R&R Produce, Inc., Other Affiliate David Rossi, Other Affiliate Daniel Rossi for R&R Produce, Inc.. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against George Argie, Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio, Debbie Kasapis, Paul G.A. Kasapis, PK Produce, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13389845.). Filed byR&R Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anastassiou, Effie) (Filed on 5/29/2019) [Transferred from cand on 7/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R&R Produce, Inc. v. PK Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PK Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul G.A. Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Kasapis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Argie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argie, D'Amico & Vitantonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R&R Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Effie F. Anastassiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?