Syracuse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Karen Syracuse
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv01687
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: James R Knepp
Referring Judge: Sara Lioi
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 8/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Witness List)(D,N)
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx Delivery Service executed upon Commissioner of Social Security through the U.S. Attorney on 8/1/2019, Social Security Administration Office of Regional Chief Counsel on 8/1/2019 and U.S. Attorney General on 8/1/2019 filed on behalf of Karen Syracuse Related document(s) #1 , #5 . (M,L)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge's Initial Order. Defendant is granted a maximum of 60 days after the complaint has been served to file an answer and transcript. Within 30 days of the filing of the answer and transcript, Plaintiff shall file its Brief on the Merits. In the event Plaintiff's brief is not filed within 30 days of the answer, case may be subject to dismissal for want of prosecution. Defendant shall file its Brief on the Merits within 30 days thereafter. Plaintiff's Reply Brief, if any, shall be filed within 14 days of filing of Defendant's Brief. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (S,JM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Original Summons issued to U.S. Marshall for service upon Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General, and Office of the U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 USM-285) (S,JM)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp II on 7/29/2019. (S,JM)
July 24, 2019 Automatic Reference [non-document] of Administrative Action to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II pursuant to Local Rule 72.2. Judge Sara Lioi on 7/24/19. (Y,A)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A)
July 24, 2019 Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (Y,A)
July 24, 2019 Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case, (Y,A)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Karen Syracuse. (Wilson, Rachel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Karen Syracuse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to SSA, #3 Summons to U.S. Atty Gen, #4 Summons to U.S. Asst. Atty, #5 USM-285 to SSA, #6 USM-285 to U.S. Atty Gen, #7 USM-285 to U.S. Asst. Atty) (Wilson, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syracuse v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Social Security Administration - Chicago
Represented By: Lynne H. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Syracuse
Represented By: Rachel C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?